EP0687366 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMAGE ALIGNMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.01.2001 [2001/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Street, Graham Stewart Brandon Impstone House, Pamber Road, Silchester Reading Berkshire RG7 2NU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states Street, Graham Stewart Brandon Impstone House, Pamber Road, Silchester Reading, Berkshire RG7 2NU / GB | ||
Former [1995/51] | For all designated states STREET, Graham Stewart Brandon Impstone House Pamber Road Silchester Reading Berkshire RG7 2NU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/51] | Representative(s) | Wilkinson, Stephen John, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | Wilkinson, Stephen John, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 94908408.1 | 02.03.1994 | [1995/51] | WO1994GB00405 | Priority number, date | GB19930004279 | 03.03.1993 Original published format: GB 9304279 | GB19930007638 | 14.04.1993 Original published format: GB 9307638 | GB19930014419 | 13.07.1993 Original published format: GB 9314419 | GB19930022579 | 02.11.1993 Original published format: GB 9322579 | GB19930024141 | 24.11.1993 Original published format: GB 9324141 | GB19940000097 | 05.01.1994 Original published format: GB 9400097 | [1995/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9420875 | Date: | 15.09.1994 | [1994/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0687366 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0687366 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/22, H04N13/04 | [1995/51] | CPC: |
G02B27/0093 (EP,US);
G02B30/27 (US);
G02B30/29 (EP);
G02B30/30 (EP);
H04N13/305 (EP,US);
H04N13/31 (EP,US);
H04N13/32 (EP,US);
H04N13/346 (EP,US);
H04N13/363 (EP,US);
H04N13/373 (EP,US);
H04N13/376 (EP,US);
H04N13/378 (EP,US);
H04N13/38 (EP,US);
H04N13/398 (EP,US);
H04N13/194 (EP,US);
H04N13/204 (EP,US);
H04N13/289 (EP,US);
H04N13/324 (EP,US);
H04N13/327 (EP,US);
H04N13/334 (EP,US);
H04N13/337 (EP,US);
H04N13/341 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/51] | Title | German: | Bildausrichtung und Gerät | [1995/51] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMAGE ALIGNMENT | [1995/51] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'ALIGNEMENT D'IMAGE | [1995/51] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/51] | 29.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1996 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.1996 | 31.03.1998 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   05.08.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4649425 (PUND MARVIN L [US]) [X] 1,34,37 * the whole document * [A] 12,16,18-20,35,39,40; | [A]EP0354851 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [A] 1,2,8,12,16,19,20,34,37,38,40* the whole document *; | [X]EP0477888 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [X] 19,40 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0493651 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [X] 19,40 * the whole document *; | [PXA]EP0576106 (DIMENSION TECH INC [US]) [PX] 1,34,37 * the whole document * [PA] 2,8,12,16,20; | [PXA]US5287437 (DEERING MICHAEL [US]) [PX] 1,34,37 * column W * [PA] 19,40 | [XA] - SCHWARTZ, "Head Tracking Stereoscopic Display", INTERNATIONAL DISPLAY RESEARCH CONFERENCE, SAN DIEGO, CA, US, (19851015), pages 141 - 144 [X] 1,20,34,37 * the whole document * [A] 2,8,9,12,13,16,18,19,21,38,40 | [XA] - MERRITT ET AL, "Developments in Autostereoscopic Technology at Dimension Technologies Inc", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE: STEREOSCOPIC DISPLAYS AND APPLICATIONS IV, SAN JOSE, CA, US, (19930201), vol. 1915, pages 177 - 186 [X] 1,16,34,37,39 * the whole document * [A] 2,3,8-12,15,18-20,38,40 |