EP0758933 - MANUFACTURE OF COPPER ROD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.03.2001 [2001/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASARCO INCORPORATED 180 Maiden Lane New York, NY 10038 / US | [1997/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUGENS, John Richmond, Jr. 525 7th Avenue Salt Lake City, UT 84103 / US | 02 /
FERREL, Stephen Lloyd 6752 South 1425 West West Jordon, UT 84084 / US | 03 /
SPENCE, Gary Lee 3301 Lometa Amarillo, TX 79109 / US | [1997/09] | Representative(s) | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 94908606.0 | 18.01.1994 | [1997/09] | WO1994US00653 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9519236 | Date: | 20.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0758933 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0758933 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.07.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/16, G01N7/10 | [1997/09] | CPC: |
B22D2/00 (EP,US);
C22B15/0095 (EP,US);
B21B2003/005 (EP,US);
B21B3/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/09] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON KUPFERSTÄBEN | [1997/09] | English: | MANUFACTURE OF COPPER ROD | [1997/09] | French: | FABRICATION D'UNE TIGE DE CUIVRE | [1997/09] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.1996 | Search fee paid | 22.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.07.1996 | Examination requested [1997/09] | 04.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS5913546 ; | [Y]JPS5874259 ; | [Y]US4907440 (MARTIN JEAN-PIERRE [CA], et al) [Y] 1-6 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 17 * * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 2 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0238054 (BRITISH STEEL CORP [GB]) [Y] 5,6 * column 1, line 1 - line 5 * * column 1, line 38 - line 44 * * column 3, line 5 - line 15 * * figures 1,2 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840511), vol. 008, no. 100, Database accession no. (M - 295), & JP59013546 A 19840124 (FURUKAWA DENKI KOGYO KK) [Y] 1-6,5,6 * abstract * * figures 1,3 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830726), vol. 007, no. 169, Database accession no. (M - 231), & JP58074259 A 19830504 (FURUKAWA DENKI KOGYO KK) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US4290823 (DOMPAS JOHN); | [Y]JPS5739066 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [Y]JPS5865557 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD) |