EP0687278 - POLYMERS CONTAINING POLYACETAL BLOCKS, METHOD OF PRODUCING THEM AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.04.1998 [1998/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/51] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUNHOFF, Angelika Panoramastrasse 3a D-69126 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
BOECKH, Dieter Zeppelinstrasse 3 D-67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 03 /
KRONER, Matthias Brucknerstrasse 25 D-67304 Eisenberg / DE | 04 /
BAUR, Richard Nelkenstrasse 1 D-67112 Mutterstadt / DE | 05 /
KUD, Alexander Am Hellbrunn 57 D-55234 Eppelsheim / DE | 06 /
SCHORNICK, Gunnar Dr.-Konrad-Adenauer-Strasse 8 D-67271 Neuleiningen / DE | 07 /
SCHWENDEMANN, Volker Am Haeuselberg 20 D-67434 Neustadt / DE | [1995/51] | Application number, filing date | 94909047.6 | 25.02.1994 | [1995/51] | WO1994EP00535 | Priority number, date | DE19934307112 | 06.03.1993 Original published format: DE 4307112 | [1995/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9420557 | Date: | 15.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0687278 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0687278 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08G2/14, C08G2/30, C11D3/00 | [1995/51] | CPC: |
C11D3/3711 (EP);
C02F5/10 (EP);
C08G2/14 (EP);
C08G2/18 (EP);
C08G2/30 (EP);
C09D17/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/51] | Title | German: | POLYACETALBLÖCKE ENTHALTENDE POLYMERISATE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [1997/18] | English: | POLYMERS CONTAINING POLYACETAL BLOCKS, METHOD OF PRODUCING THEM AND THEIR USE | [1995/51] | French: | POLYMERISATS CONTENANT DES BLOCS POLYACETAL, LEUR PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION | [1995/51] |
Former [1995/51] | POLYACETALBLÖCKE ENTHALTENDE POLYMERISATE, VERFAHHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.1995 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/51] | 12.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.1996 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.06.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4731441 (SEGAL MARCOS [DE], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,9 * |