EP0689462 - IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO CONTRAST AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2002 [2002/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NYCOMED IMAGING AS Nycoveien 2, P.O. Box 4220, Torshov 0401 Oslo 4 / NO | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | For all designated states NYCOMED IMAGING AS Nycoveien 2, Postboks 4220, Torshov N-0401 Oslo 4 / NO | ||
Former [1996/01] | For:GB
HOLMES, Michael John Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | ||
For all designated states NYCOMED IMAGING AS Nycoveien 2, Postboks 4220, Torshov N-0401 Oslo 4 / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AABYE, Arne Harald Lovenskiolds vei 16 N-0751 Oslo / NO | 02 /
BERG, Arne Stasjonsveien 37D N-1300 Sandvika / NO | 03 /
DUGSTAD, Harald Jupiterveien 13 N-0489 Oslo / NO | 04 /
DYVIK, Kari Tamburveien 13H N-0485 Oslo / NO | 05 /
FOSS, Per, Antonius Konventveien 3B N-0377 Oslo / NO | 06 /
KLAVENESS, Jo Midtasen 5 N-1166 Oslo / NO | 07 /
OSTENSEN, Jonny Lonneveien 8C N-1053 Oslo / NO | 08 /
RONGVED, P l Hovdens vei 11 N-1450 Nesoddtangen / NO | 09 /
STRANDE, Per Nordengveien 78A N-0755 Oslo / NO | 10 /
TOLLESHAUG, Helge Arrundveien 24 N-0588 Oslo / NO | [1996/01] | Representative(s) | Marsden, John Christopher, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/01] | Marsden, John Christopher, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94909227.4 | 16.03.1994 | [1996/01] | WO1994GB00522 | Priority number, date | GB19930005351 | 16.03.1993 Original published format: GB 9305351 | [1996/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9421302 | Date: | 29.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0689462 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K49/00 | [1996/01] | CPC: |
A61K49/227 (EP);
A61K49/00 (KR);
A61K49/223 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/01] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN AN UND IN BEZIEHUNG ZU KONTRASTMITTELN | [1996/01] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO CONTRAST AGENTS | [1996/01] | French: | PERFECTIONNEMENTS APPORTES AUX AGENTS DE CONTRASTE | [1996/01] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.1995 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.09.1995 | Examination requested [1996/01] | 24.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/12] | 19.07.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4900540 (RYAN PATRICK J [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 2, line 52 - line 68; example 2; claim - *; | [X]WO9003800 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP])[X] 1-3,9,11,12,14; | [X]US5147631 (GLAJCH JOSEPH L [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-15 * claim - *; | [PDX]WO9317718 (NYCOMED IMAGING AS [NO]) [PDX] 1-4,8-15 * page 4, line 36 - line 12 * * page 5, line 32 - page 6, line 2 * * page 18, line 23 - line 34; claims 1,15-17 * | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19921207), vol. 117, no. 23, Database accession no. 229280y [X] 1,2,5-10,12-15 * abstract * | [ ] - WALTER C. EISENBERG ET AL., "OXIDATION OF PHOSPHATIDYLCHOLINE MEMBRANES BY SINGLET OXYGEN GENERATED IN THE GAS PHASE", PHOTOCHEM. PHOTOBIOL., (1992), vol. 56, no. 4, pages 441 - 445 |