EP0687169 - SURFACE MATERIAL FOR ABSORBENT ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mölnlycke Health Care AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states Mölnlycke Health Care AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [1995/51] | For all designated states Mölnlycke AB S-405 03 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BILLGREN, Tomas Pl 3560 S-430 41 Kullavik / SE | [1995/51] | Representative(s) | Hyltner, Jan-Olof, et al Albihns.Zacco Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Hyltner, Jan-Olof, et al Albihns AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1999/06] | Hyltner, Jan-Olof, et al AB Dahls Patentbyra, Box 606 182 16 Danderyd / SE | ||
Former [1995/51] | Hyltner, Jan-Olof, et al Noréns Patentbyra AB, Box 10198 S-100 55 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 94909369.4 | 23.02.1994 | [1995/51] | WO1994SE00150 | Priority number, date | SE19930000683 | 01.03.1993 Original published format: SE 9300683 | [1995/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9420054 | Date: | 15.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0687169 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0687169 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 15.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/02, A61F13/15 | [1995/51] | CPC: |
A61F13/01021 (EP);
A61F13/15731 (EP);
A61F13/51104 (EP);
A61F13/5126 (EP);
A61F13/51 (EP);
A61F2013/00251 (EP);
A61F2013/00327 (EP);
A61F2013/00859 (EP);
A61F2013/15926 (EP);
A61F2013/51078 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1995/51] | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENMATERIAL FÜR ABSORBIERENDE ARTIKEL | [1995/51] | English: | SURFACE MATERIAL FOR ABSORBENT ARTICLES | [1995/51] | French: | MATERIAU DE SURFACE UTILISE DANS LES ARTICLES ABSORBANTS | [1995/51] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 28.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/51] | 19.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 24.11.1999 | ES | 24.11.1999 | FR | 24.11.1999 | IT | 24.11.1999 | SE | 24.11.1999 | GB | 24.02.2000 | DE | 25.02.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | BE | 24.11.1999 | |
ES | 24.11.1999 | ||
FR | 24.11.1999 | ||
SE | 24.11.1999 | ||
GB | 24.02.2000 | ||
DE | 25.02.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | BE | 24.11.1999 | |
ES | 24.11.1999 | ||
SE | 24.11.1999 | ||
GB | 24.02.2000 | ||
DE | 25.02.2000 | ||
FR | 21.04.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | BE | 24.11.1999 | |
SE | 24.11.1999 | ||
GB | 24.02.2000 | ||
DE | 25.02.2000 | ||
FR | 21.04.2000 | ||
Former [2002/09] | BE | 24.11.1999 | |
GB | 24.02.2000 | ||
DE | 25.02.2000 | ||
FR | 21.04.2000 | ||
Former [2001/12] | BE | 24.11.1999 | |
GB | 24.02.2000 | ||
FR | 21.04.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | BE | 24.11.1999 | |
FR | 21.04.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | BE | 24.11.1999 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3602220 (BUNYAN JOHN); | [Y]EP0057484 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [Y]US4704112 (SUZUKI MIGAKU [JP], et al); | [X]WO9111161 (SMITH & NEPHEW [GB]) |