EP0687213 - APPARATUS FOR DEBARKING LOGS INDIVIDUALLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORDIN, Ulf Mazurkavägen 4 S-663 02 Hammarö / SE | For all designated states Börjesson, Lennart Rud 663 02 Hammarö / SE | For all designated states ERIKSSON, Roland Södra Bryggerivägen 36 S-663 02 Hammarö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | For all designated states NORDIN, Ulf Mazurkavägen 4 S-663 02 Hammarö / SE | ||
For all designated states BÖRJESSON, Lennart Rud S-663 02 Hammarö / SE | |||
For all designated states ERIKSSON, Roland Södra Bryggerivägen 36 S-663 02 Hammarö / SE | |||
Former [1995/51] | For all designated states NORDIN, Ulf Mazurkavägen 4 S-663 02 Hammarö / SE | ||
For all designated states BORJESSON, Lennart Rud S-663 02 Hammarö / SE | |||
For all designated states ERIKSSON, Roland Södra Bryggerivägen 36 S-663 02 Hammarö / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/51] | Representative(s) | Hynell, Magnus Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls väg 2 683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/51] | Hynell, Magnus Hynell Patenttjänst AB, Box 2236 S-683 02 Hagfors / SE | Application number, filing date | 94909374.4 | 28.02.1994 | [1995/51] | WO1994SE00161 | Priority number, date | SE19930000763 | 05.03.1993 Original published format: SE 9300763 | [1995/51] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9420272 | Date: | 15.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0687213 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0687213 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 15.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B27L1/14 | [1995/51] | CPC: |
B27L1/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, PT [1995/51] | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUM ENTRINDEN EINZELNER BAUMSTÄMME | [1995/51] | English: | APPARATUS FOR DEBARKING LOGS INDIVIDUALLY | [1995/51] | French: | APPAREIL UTILISE POUR L'ECOR AGE INDIVIDUEL DES GRUMES | [1995/51] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.1994 | Translation filed | 25.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 28.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/51] | 19.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 05.08.1998 | FR | 05.08.1998 | IT | 05.08.1998 | DK | 05.11.1998 | PT | 05.11.1998 | GB | 28.02.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | ES | 05.08.1998 | |
FR | 05.08.1998 | ||
DK | 05.11.1998 | ||
PT | 05.11.1998 | ||
GB | 28.02.1999 | ||
Former [2003/45] | ES | 05.08.1998 | |
DK | 05.11.1998 | ||
PT | 05.11.1998 | ||
FR | 31.12.1998 | ||
GB | 28.02.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 05.08.1998 | |
PT | 05.11.1998 | ||
FR | 31.12.1998 | ||
GB | 28.02.1999 | ||
Former [2001/05] | PT | 05.11.1998 | |
FR | 31.12.1998 | ||
GB | 28.02.1999 | ||
Former [1999/29] | PT | 05.11.1998 | |
FR | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | FR | 31.12.1998 | Cited in | International search | [XY]SE131040 ; | [Y]SE145115 ; | [Y]SE9100854 ; | [Y]SE460406 (SOEDERHAMNS VERKSTAEDER AB [SE]); | [Y]US4640327 (KRILOV ALEXANDRE [AU]); | [Y]US3942565 (RATELLE CLEMENT, et al) |