EP0687170 - ABSORBENT ARTICLES, SUCH AS A DIAPER, A PANTS-TYPE DIAPER, AN INCONTINENCE GUARD, A SANITARY NAPKIN OR LIKE ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1999 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.1999 [1999/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCA Hygiene Products AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE | [1999/02] |
Former [1998/04] | For all designated states SCA Mölnlycke AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [1995/51] | For all designated states Mölnlycke AB S-405 03 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALL, Benny Bäfverfeltsgatan 9 S-412 73 Gothenburg / SE | 02 /
TERNSTRÖM, Ingela Persikovägen 13 S-435 43 Mölnlycke / SE | [1995/51] | Representative(s) | Kierkegaard, Lars-Olov, et al Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/51] | Kierkegaard, Lars-Olov, et al H. Albihns Patentbyra AB, P.O. Box 3137 S-103 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 94909395.9 | 04.03.1994 | [1995/51] | WO1994SE00188 | Priority number, date | SE19930000736 | 05.03.1993 Original published format: SE 9300736 | [1995/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9420056 | Date: | 15.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0687170 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0687170 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 15.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [1995/51] | CPC: |
A61F13/49009 (EP,US);
A61F2013/49025 (EP,US);
A61F2013/49031 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/51] | Title | German: | ABSORBIERENDER ARTIKEL, WIE EINE WINDEL, EINE HOSENÄHNLICHE WINDEL, EIN INKONTINENZSCHUTZ, EINE DAMENBINDE ODER ÄHNLICHES | [1998/30] | English: | ABSORBENT ARTICLES, SUCH AS A DIAPER, A PANTS-TYPE DIAPER, AN INCONTINENCE GUARD, A SANITARY NAPKIN OR LIKE ARTICLE | [1995/51] | French: | ARTICLES ABSORBANTS TELS QU'UNE COUCHE, UNE COUCHE-CULOTTE, UNE PROTECTION CONTRE L'INCONTINENCE, UNE SERVIETTE HYGIENIQUE OU L'EQUIVALENT | [1995/51] |
Former [1995/51] | ABSORBIERENDER ARTIKEL, WI EEINE WINDEL, EINE HOSENÄHNLICHE WINDEL, EIN INKONTINENZSCHUTZ, EINE DAMENBINDE ODER ÄHNLICHES | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/51] | 15.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0219326 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [A]EP0311333 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) |