EP0690706 - WINDOWLESS FRAME DELIVERED DRESSING AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEINECKE, Steven, B. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
PETERSON, Donald, G. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1996/02] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/02] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94909573.1 | 08.02.1994 | [1996/02] | WO1994US01407 | Priority number, date | US19930034306 | 22.03.1993 Original published format: US 34306 | [1996/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9421207 | Date: | 29.09.1994 | [1994/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0690706 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0690706 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/02 | [1996/02] | CPC: |
A61F13/0276 (EP,US);
A61F13/023 (EP,US);
A61F13/0203 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00412 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00663 (EP,US);
A61F2013/0074 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00744 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00748 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00761 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00834 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00868 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00876 (EP,US);
A61F2013/0091 (EP,US);
A61F2013/15878 (EP,US);
A61F2013/15918 (EP,US);
Y10S602/90 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1056 (EP,US);
Y10T156/108 (EP,US);
Y10T428/15 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/02] | Title | German: | MIT FENSTERLOSEM RAHMEN ABGEBENER VERBAND SOWIE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [1996/02] | English: | WINDOWLESS FRAME DELIVERED DRESSING AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE | [1996/02] | French: | PANSEMENT DISTRIBUE AVEC CADRE SANS FENETRE | [1996/02] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.1995 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.10.1995 | Examination requested [1996/05] | 22.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.01.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0090564 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1,2,5-10,25 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3; | [Y]US5106383 (MULDER ROBERT S [US], et al) [Y] 2,3 * column A *; | [XA]EP0236104 (COURTAULDS PLC [GB]) [X] 1,2,5-10,25 * examples 1-2 * [A] 11-24; | [PXA]EP0541251 (FERRIS MFG CORP [US]) [PX] 1,2,5-10,25 * page 5, line 14 - line 37 * [A] 11,23; | [X]EP0465023 (HOLLISTER INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5-10,25 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0090564 | US5160315 | USRE24906E | US4737410 | US3389827 | US4112213 | US4310509 | US4323557 |