EP0699118 - ON-BOARD TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WGF FAHRZEUGTEILE GmbH Schlarper Strasse 14 D-37170 Uslar-Volpriehausen / DE | [1996/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAACK, Björn Rügelsbarg 69b D-22395 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
FRIEDRICH, Rainer Duhmblick 20 D-37191 Katlenburg / DE | 03 /
GÜRTLER, Jürgen Birkenweg 21 D-37186 Moringen / DE | [1996/10] | Representative(s) | Sobisch, Peter, et al Sobisch & Callies Benrather Strasse 21 42697 Solingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/10] | Sobisch, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Inge. Röse, Kosel & Sobisch, Odastrasse 4a D-37581 Bad Gandersheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 94909936.0 | 11.03.1994 | [1996/10] | WO1994EP00762 | Priority number, date | DE19930007619U | 19.05.1993 Original published format: DE 9307619 U | DE19930017715U | 13.11.1993 Original published format: DE 9317715 U | [1996/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9426473 | Date: | 24.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0699118 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0699118 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B25F1/02, B25G3/26, B60D1/145 | [1996/10] | CPC: |
B60D1/145 (EP);
B25F1/02 (EP);
B25G3/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1996/10] | Title | German: | BORDWERKZEUG | [1996/10] | English: | ON-BOARD TOOL | [1996/10] | French: | OUTIL DE BORD | [1996/10] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.08.1995 | Examination requested [1996/10] | 14.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 18.12.1996 | GB | 18.12.1996 | IT | 18.12.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | GB | 18.12.1996 | |
IT | 18.12.1996 | ||
FR | 16.05.1997 | ||
Former [1997/44] | GB | 18.12.1996 | |
FR | 16.05.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | GB | 18.12.1996 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2838327 (COLLINS HORACE R) [A] 7 * figure - *; | [A]WO8909709 (ROSSMANN VIKTOR [AT]) [A] 9* abstract *; | [YA]US5086674 (HER JERN-SHONG [TW]) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * [A] 6,10,11; | [YA]CH680721 (HANS RUDOLF WIDMER) [Y] 1-3 * figure -; claims 1,6 * [A] 4,5,12 | Examination | US4023221 |