EP0691347 - HEPATIC PARENCHYMAL CELL GROWTH SUBSTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD 24-1 Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 171 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | For all designated states TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD 24-1 Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 171 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARA, Hiroshi Taisho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 24-1, Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 171 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIMURA, Hiromitsu Taisho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 24-1, Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 171 / JP | 03 /
MATSUKI, Yumiko Taisho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 24-1, Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 171 / JP | 04 /
SHINDO, Saeko Taisho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 24-1, Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 171 / JP | 05 /
HANADA, Kazunori Taisho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 24-1, Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 171 / JP | [1996/02] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/02] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94910055.6 | 22.03.1994 | [1996/02] | WO1994JP00455 | Priority number, date | JP19930063905 | 23.03.1993 Original published format: JP 6390593 | [1996/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9421678 | Date: | 29.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0691347 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.09.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K13/00, C12N15/85, C12N5/10, C07K15/28 | [1997/30] | CPC: |
C07K14/4753 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/02] | C07K13/00, C12N15/19, C12P21/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/02] | Title | German: | WACHSTUMSSUBSTANZ FÜR LEBERPARENCHYMZELLEN | [1996/02] | English: | HEPATIC PARENCHYMAL CELL GROWTH SUBSTANCE | [1996/02] | French: | SUBSTANCE DE CROISSANCE DES CELLULES DU PARENCHYME HEPATIQUE | [1996/02] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.1995 | Translation filed | 19.10.1995 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.1995 | Search fee paid | 19.10.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 19.10.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 02.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/16] | 08.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH03255096 ; | [A]EP0412557 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]) [A] 1-14 * page 3, line 1 - line 12 * * page 3, line 39 - page 6, line 9 *; | [A] - "Recombinant rat liver parenchymatous cell growth factor providing means for growth of liver parenchymatous cell ouside of living body", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 01, Database accession no. 92-002670, XP002032013 & JPH03255096 A 19911113 (TOYOBO KK) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH0418028 (NAKAMURA TOSHIICHI, et al) | [PX] - Biochem. Biophys. Res. Commun., Vol. 193, No. 2, p. 681-687; T. YAMAMOTO et al.: "Molecular Cloning and Initial Characterization of a Novel Fibrinogen Related Gene, HFREP-1". |