EP0693912 - AN APPARATUS FOR MEDICAL TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wallsten Medical S.A. Chemin de Chapallaz CH-1135 Denens / CH | [1996/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALLSTEN, Hans, I. Villa Pré-Boisé CH-1141 Denens / CH | 02 /
DUC, Jérome Bolliette 1 CH-1802 Corseaux / CH | [1998/35] |
Former [1996/05] | 01 /
WALLST N, Hans, I. Villa Pré-Boisé CH-1141 Denens / CH | ||
02 /
DUC, Jérome Bolliette 1 CH-1802 Corseaux / CH | Representative(s) | Larsson, Kjell, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | Larsson, Kjell, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 45086 S-104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 94910619.9 | 11.03.1994 | [1996/05] | WO1994SE00208 | Priority number, date | SE19930000919 | 19.03.1993 Original published format: SE 9300919 | [1996/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9421203 | Date: | 29.09.1994 | [1994/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0693912 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0693912 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 29.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61F7/12 | [1996/05] | CPC: |
A61F7/123 (EP);
A61B2017/00557 (EP);
A61B2017/4216 (EP);
A61F2007/0054 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/05] | Title | German: | GERÄT FÜR MEDIZINISCHE BEHANDLUNGEN | [1996/05] | English: | AN APPARATUS FOR MEDICAL TREATMENT | [1996/05] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT MEDICAL | [1996/05] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.1995 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 04.09.1995 | Examination requested [1996/05] | 31.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 31.03.1999 | [2003/45] | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9002525 ; | [X]US4160455 ; | [A]WO9105528 ; | [A]WO9105580 ; | [A]US4758223 |