EP0694092 - FIBER BLENDS FOR IMPROVED CARPET TEXTURE RETENTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.1999 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.11.1999 [1999/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUNG, Wae-Hai 101 Surrey Drive Seaford, DE 19973 / US | 02 /
SIMONSEN, Leif, Richard 601 Pelham Drive Waynesboro, VA 22980-1591 / US | 03 /
VINOD, Yashavant, Vinayak 6 Farm House Circle Hockessin, DE 19707 / US | 04 /
WERNY, Frank 334 Old Bailey Lane West Chester, PA 19382 / US | [1996/05] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner, Poschingerstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner, Poschingerstrasse 6 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94910720.5 | 07.03.1994 | [1996/05] | WO1994US01861 | Priority number, date | US19930028112 | 09.03.1993 Original published format: US 28112 | [1996/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9420657 | Date: | 15.09.1994 | [1994/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0694092 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0694092 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | D02G3/40, D02G3/44 | [1996/05] | CPC: |
D02G3/445 (EP,US);
D02G3/045 (EP,US);
D10B2321/02 (EP,US);
D10B2331/02 (EP,US);
D10B2331/04 (EP,US);
Y10T428/23957 (EP,US);
Y10T428/23993 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24826 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2909 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1996/05] | Title | German: | MISCHFASERN FÜR VERBESSERTE TEPPICHSTRUKTURAUFRECHTERHALTUNG | [1996/05] | English: | FIBER BLENDS FOR IMPROVED CARPET TEXTURE RETENTION | [1996/05] | French: | MELANGE DE FIBRE SERVANT AMELIORER LA RETENUE DE LA TEXTURE D'UN TAPIS | [1996/05] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.08.1995 | Examination requested [1996/05] | 25.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO8803969 (ALLIED CORP [US]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2124919 (COATS J ET P LTD) [A] 1 * page 2, line 11 - line 20 * * page 3, line 11 - line 13 *; | [A]US3494822 (WELDON LEONARD HARVEY POCOCK) [A] 1 * column W *; | [AD]GB2205116 (WOOL RES ORGANISATION) [AD] 1 * the whole document * |