EP0693199 - AUTOMATIC IDENTIFICATION OF THE LONG AXIS OF THE LEFT VENTRICLE FROM NUCLEAR MEDICINE SPECT DATA FOR USE IN MYOCARDIAL PERFUSION STUDIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.1999 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.06.1999 [1999/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INC. 186 Wood Avenue South Iselin New Jersey 08830 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/04] | For all designated states SIEMENS MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INC. 186 Wood Avenue South Iselin, New Jersey 08830 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEVITO, Raymond, P. 255 West Hellen Road Palatine, IL 60067 / US | 02 /
QIAN, Jianzhong 3 Oxford Court Princeton, NJ 08850 / US | [1996/04] | Representative(s) | Epping, Wilhelm, et al Patentanwalt Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/28] | Epping, Wilhelm, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/04] | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing., et al Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94910760.1 | 14.02.1994 | [1996/04] | WO1994US02076 | Priority number, date | US19930030928 | 12.03.1993 Original published format: US 30928 | [1996/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9420922 | Date: | 15.09.1994 | [1994/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0693199 | Date: | 24.01.1996 | [1996/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0693199 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00 | [1998/27] | CPC: |
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
G06T7/12 (EP,US);
G06T7/60 (EP,US);
G06T7/64 (EP,US);
G06T7/70 (EP,US);
G06T7/73 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1996/04] | G06F15/70 | Designated contracting states | FR, NL [1996/04] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE IDENTIFIZIERUNG DER GROSSEN ACHSE DES LINKEN HERZKAMMERS AUS NUKLEARMEDIZIN SPECT DATEN, ZUR VERWENDUNG IN MYOKARDIALEN PERFUSIONSSTUDIEN | [1996/04] | English: | AUTOMATIC IDENTIFICATION OF THE LONG AXIS OF THE LEFT VENTRICLE FROM NUCLEAR MEDICINE SPECT DATA FOR USE IN MYOCARDIAL PERFUSION STUDIES | [1996/04] | French: | IDENTIFICATION AUTOMATIQUE DU GRAND AXE DU VENTRICULE GAUCHE A PARTIR DE DONNEES SPECT DE MEDECINE NUCLEAIRE DESTINEES A ETRE UTILISEES DANS LES ETUDES DE PERFUSION MYOCARDIQUE | [1996/04] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.1995 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.07.1995 | Examination requested [1996/04] | 08.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A] - CAUVIN J.C. ET AL., "Automatic detection of the left ventricular myocardium long axis and center in thallium-201 single photon emission computed tomography", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, GERMANY, (199212), vol. 19, no. 12, pages 1032 - 1037 [A] 1,6 * the whole document * | [A] - R. GLACHET ET AL., "Finding the perspective projection of an axis of revolution", PATTERN RECOGNITION LETTERS, AMSTERDAM NL, (199111), vol. 12, no. 11, pages 693 - 700, XP000243542 [A] 1,6 * page 695, column L, paragraph 3 - page 699, column L, paragraph 6; figures 3,8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-8655(91)90007-9 | [A] - E.PETIT ET AL., "Estimation des volumes ventriculaires gauches par détection et suivi de contours sur des séquences d'images échocardiographiques", ONDE ELECTRIQUE, PARIS FR, (199107), vol. 71, no. 4, pages 41 - 44, XP000243164 [A] 1,6 * page 42, column L, paragraph 2; figure 1 * | [A] - LEE T. ANDREWS ET AL., "An MR Workstation for quantitative analysis of cardiac images", PROCEEDINGS OF COMPUTERS IN CARDIOLOGY ,SEPTEMBER 25-28,1988 ,WASHINGTON(US);IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY PRESS ,LOS ALAMITOS (US), pages 445 - 448 [A] 1,6 * page 446, column R, line 1 - line 11; figures 2,6 * | [A] - RICHARD F. LEIGHTON ET AL., "left ventricular function from computer processed magnetic resonance images", PROCEEDINGS OF COMPUTERS IN CARDIOLOGY ,JERUSALEM,ISRAEL ,SEPTEMBER 19-22,1989;IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY PRESS,LOS ALAMITOS /US), pages 203 - 206, XP000147063 [A] 1,6 * page 203 - page 204; figures 1,4 * | Examination | - PATTERN RECOGNITION LETTERS vol. 12, no. 11 , November 1991 AMSTERDAM NL | - pages 693 - 700 XP243542 R. GLACHET ET AL. 'Finding the perspective projection of an axis of revolution' DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-8655(91)90007-9 |