EP0659092 - PERITONEAL DIALYSIS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEKA PRODUCTS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP 340 Commercial Street Manchester, NH 03101 / US | [1995/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRYANT, Robert, J. 36 Golfview Drive Manchester, NH 03102 / US | 02 /
KAMEN, Dean 44 Gage Road Bedford, NH 03110 / US | 03 /
VINCENT, Douglas, E. 287-1 Canal Street Manchester, NH 03101 / US | 04 /
LANIGAN, Richard 6 Angela Way Concord, NH 03301 / US | 05 /
SPENCER, Geoffrey, P. 70 Eastmeadow Way Manchester, NH 03109 / US | 06 /
VILLENEUVE, Richard, R. 6 Holbrook Road Bedford, NH 03110 / US | [1995/26] | Representative(s) | MacGregor, Gordon, et al Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | MacGregor, Gordon, et al ERIC POTTER CLARKSON St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham, NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 94910775.9 | 28.02.1994 | [1995/26] | WO1994US02129 | Priority number, date | US19930026458 | 03.03.1993 Original published format: US 26458 | [1995/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9420158 | Date: | 15.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0659092 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0659092 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/28, A61M5/168, G01F15/04, G01F1/34 | [1995/26] | CPC: |
G01F15/046 (EP,US);
A61M1/1524 (EP,US);
A61M1/155 (EP,US);
A61M1/1565 (EP,US);
A61M1/159 (EP,US);
A61M1/28 (EP,US);
A61M1/281 (EP,US);
A61M1/288 (EP,US);
A61M5/16809 (EP,US);
A61M5/16854 (EP,US);
G01F1/34 (EP,US);
A61M1/154 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/26] | Title | German: | PERITONEALDIALYSESYSTEM | [1995/26] | English: | PERITONEAL DIALYSIS SYSTEM | [1995/26] | French: | SYSTEME DE DIALYSE PERITONEALE | [1995/26] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.1994 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/26] | 08.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.04.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.10.2000 | BE | 11.10.2000 | CH | 11.10.2000 | ES | 11.10.2000 | GR | 11.10.2000 | IT | 11.10.2000 | LI | 11.10.2000 | NL | 11.10.2000 | DK | 11.01.2001 | PT | 11.01.2001 | IE | 28.02.2001 | LU | 28.02.2001 | MC | 28.02.2001 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/39] | AT | 11.10.2000 | |
BE | 11.10.2000 | ||
CH | 11.10.2000 | ||
ES | 11.10.2000 | ||
GR | 11.10.2000 | ||
LI | 11.10.2000 | ||
NL | 11.10.2000 | ||
DK | 11.01.2001 | ||
PT | 11.01.2001 | ||
IE | 28.02.2001 | ||
LU | 28.02.2001 | ||
MC | 28.02.2001 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 11.10.2000 | |
BE | 11.10.2000 | ||
CH | 11.10.2000 | ||
ES | 11.10.2000 | ||
GR | 11.10.2000 | ||
LI | 11.10.2000 | ||
NL | 11.10.2000 | ||
DK | 11.01.2001 | ||
PT | 11.01.2001 | ||
IE | 28.02.2001 | ||
LU | 28.02.2001 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 11.10.2000 | |
BE | 11.10.2000 | ||
CH | 11.10.2000 | ||
ES | 11.10.2000 | ||
GR | 11.10.2000 | ||
LI | 11.10.2000 | ||
NL | 11.10.2000 | ||
DK | 11.01.2001 | ||
PT | 11.01.2001 | ||
IE | 28.02.2001 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 11.10.2000 | |
BE | 11.10.2000 | ||
CH | 11.10.2000 | ||
ES | 11.10.2000 | ||
LI | 11.10.2000 | ||
NL | 11.10.2000 | ||
DK | 11.01.2001 | ||
PT | 11.01.2001 | ||
IE | 28.02.2001 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 11.10.2000 | |
BE | 11.10.2000 | ||
CH | 11.10.2000 | ||
ES | 11.10.2000 | ||
LI | 11.10.2000 | ||
NL | 11.10.2000 | ||
PT | 11.01.2001 | ||
IE | 28.02.2001 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 11.10.2000 | |
BE | 11.10.2000 | ||
CH | 11.10.2000 | ||
ES | 11.10.2000 | ||
LI | 11.10.2000 | ||
PT | 11.01.2001 | ||
IE | 28.02.2001 | ||
Former [2002/14] | AT | 11.10.2000 | |
BE | 11.10.2000 | ||
CH | 11.10.2000 | ||
LI | 11.10.2000 | ||
PT | 11.01.2001 | ||
IE | 28.02.2001 | ||
Former [2002/11] | AT | 11.10.2000 | |
BE | 11.10.2000 | ||
CH | 11.10.2000 | ||
LI | 11.10.2000 | ||
PT | 11.01.2001 | ||
Former [2002/10] | AT | 11.10.2000 | |
BE | 11.10.2000 | ||
CH | 11.10.2000 | ||
LI | 11.10.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 11.10.2000 | |
BE | 11.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/37] | AT | 11.10.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2593911 (CERM SARL [FR]) [A] 2 * abstract * * page 4, line 2 - line 6 *; | [A]WO8705223 (KAMEN DEAN L [US]); | [A]WO8901795 (KAMEN DEAN L [US]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 4 - page 9, line 13 *; | [Y]US4956996 (MORRIS BRIAN G [US]) [Y] 2,3,9,10 * column A; figure - * * column 5, line 17 - column 6, line 28 *; | [XY]WO9013795 (DEKA PRODUCTS LP [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 8, line 22 - page 11, line 10 * * page 21, line 20 - page 22, line 17 * [Y] 2-6,9-14; | [Y]EP0491159 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 4-6,11-14 * abstract * * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 2 * |