EP0690721 - TREATMENT OF MYCOBACTERIAL DISEASES BY ADMINISTRATION OF BACTERICIDAL/PERMEABILITY-INCREASING PROTEIN PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1999 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1999 [1999/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states XOMA Corporation 2910 Seventh Street Berkeley California 94710-2737 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | For all designated states Xoma Corporation 2910 Seventh Street Berkeley California 94710 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAMBERT, Lewis H., Jr. 45928 Omega Drive Fremont, CA 94539 / US | [1996/02] | Representative(s) | Brown, John D. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | Brown, John David FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94910876.5 | 11.03.1994 | [1996/02] | WO1994US02463 | Priority number, date | US19930031145 | 12.03.1993 Original published format: US 31145 | [1996/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9420129 | Date: | 15.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0690721 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0690721 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00 | [1998/14] | CPC: |
A61K38/1751 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/02] | A61K37/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/02] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON MYCOBAKTERIELLEN ERKRANKUNGEN DURCH VERABREICHUNG VON BAKRERIENTÖTENDE, DURCHLÄSSIGKEITSERHÖHENDE PROTEINFRAGMENTE | [1996/02] | English: | TREATMENT OF MYCOBACTERIAL DISEASES BY ADMINISTRATION OF BACTERICIDAL/PERMEABILITY-INCREASING PROTEIN PRODUCTS | [1996/02] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES MYCOBACTERIENNES PAR ADMINSTRATION DE PRODUITS PROTEIQUES BACTERICIDES/AUGMENTANT LA PERMEABILITE | [1996/02] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.1995 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.09.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 04.10.1996 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 30.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.1996 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 18.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9203535 (INCYTE PHARMA INC [US]) [A] 1-26 *PAGES 1-4; CLAIMS*; | [A]WO9209621 (UNIV NEW YORK [US]) [A] 1-26* the whole document * | [PX] - KELLY C.J. ET AL., "Role of bactericidal permeability-increasing protein in the treatment of gram-negative pneumonia", SURGERY, ST LOUIS, (199308), vol. 114, no. 2, pages 140 - 146 [PX] 1-26 * the whole document * |