EP0693019 - WORKBENCH, ESPECIALLY A TEACHING AID IN THE FORM OF AN ERGONOMICALLY DESIGNED MULTI-PURPOSE WORKBENCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thormeier, Klaus, Dr.-Ing. Ackerstrasse 37 51519 Odenthal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/04] | For all designated states Thormeier, Klaus Ackerstrasse 37 D-51519 Oldenthal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/04] | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstrasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/04] | Patentanwalts-Partnerschaft Rotermund + Pfusch Waiblinger Strasse 11 D-70372 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 94911101.7 | 31.03.1994 | [1996/04] | WO1994DE00377 | Priority number, date | DE19934311965 | 10.04.1993 Original published format: DE 4311965 | [1996/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9423908 | Date: | 27.10.1994 | [1994/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0693019 | Date: | 24.01.1996 | [1996/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0693019 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B25H1/08 | [1996/04] | CPC: |
B25H1/08 (EP,US);
B25H1/10 (EP,US);
Y10S269/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/04] | Title | German: | WERKBANK, INSEBESONDERE ALS LEHRMITTEL IN DER FORM EINER ERGONOMISCH GESTALTETEN MEHRZWECK-WERKBANK | [1996/04] | English: | WORKBENCH, ESPECIALLY A TEACHING AID IN THE FORM OF AN ERGONOMICALLY DESIGNED MULTI-PURPOSE WORKBENCH | [1996/04] | French: | ETABLI UTILISE NOTAMMENT A DES FINS PEDAGOGIQUES ET SE PRESENTANT SOUS FORME D'ETABLI ERGONOMIQUE A USAGES MULTIPLES | [1996/04] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.1995 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.09.1995 | Examination requested [1996/04] | 01.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 30.10.1996 | SE | 30.01.1997 | [2002/26] |
Former [1997/39] | SE | 30.01.1997 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE192703 (GUTTENBERG) [Y] 1-3,6 * the whole document *; | [Y]CH114327 (QUIDORT ERNST [CH]) [Y] 1-3,6 * the whole document *; | [A]CH144071 (RUEETSCHI C [CH]) [A] 4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0098101 (HILTON PRODUCTS [GB]) [A] 1,6-9,11,18,20 * page 7, line 9 - line 17 * * page 8, line 3 - line 23; figures 1-3,5,9-13 *; | [A]GB2228705 (GATES HAROLD WILLIAM) [A] 6,7,11-13,15,18* page 3, line 24 - page 5, line 23; figures 1,2,5,6 * | [A] - "IMPROVED BENCHDOG", FINE WOODWORKING, NEWTON, CT US, (199008), no. 83, page 16 [A] 6,7,11,12,15,18 |