EP0691840 - SILICONE BASED SKIN CARE PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 30.05.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUEST INTERNATIONAL B.V. Huizerstraatweg 28 1411 GP Naarden / NL | [1997/47] |
Former [1996/03] | For all designated states QUEST INTERNATIONAL NEDERLAND BV Huizerstraatweg 28 NL-1411 GP Naarden / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAW, Philip David 12 The Spinney, Godinton Park Ashford, Kent TN23 3LF / GB | [1996/03] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Heather Clare, et al Nash Matthews LLP 24 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1JP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Matthews, Heather Clare, et al Nash Matthews 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | ||
Former [2000/27] | Matthews, Heather Clare, et al Keith W Nash & Co Pearl Assurance House 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | ||
Former [2000/23] | Matthews, Heather Clare, et al Keith W Nash & Co Pearl Assurance House 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | ||
Former [1998/02] | Graham, John George, et al ICI Group Intellectual Property P.O. Box 90 Wilton Middlesbrough, Cleveland TS90 8JE / GB | ||
Former [1996/03] | Dekker, Enno E.J., et al Unilever N.V. Patents Division P.O. Box 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 94911118.1 | 04.03.1994 | [1996/03] | WO1994EP00638 | Priority number, date | EP19930200984 | 05.04.1993 Original published format: EP 93200984 | [1996/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9422420 | Date: | 13.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0691840 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0691840 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48 | [1996/03] | CPC: |
A61Q15/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/042 (EP,US);
A61K8/046 (EP,US);
A61K8/064 (EP,US);
A61K8/068 (EP,US);
A61K8/894 (EP,US);
A61K2800/262 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/03] | Title | German: | HAUTPFLEGEPRODUKTE AUF DER BASIS VON SILIKON | [1998/32] | English: | SILICONE BASED SKIN CARE PRODUCTS | [1996/03] | French: | PRODUITS DERMATOLOGIQUES A BASE DE SILICONE | [1996/03] |
Former [1996/03] | HAUTPFLEGEPRODUKTEN AUF DER BASIS VON SILIKON | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.08.1995 | Examination requested [1996/03] | 10.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.04.1999
ADMISSIBLE HENKEL KGaA VTP (Patente) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.04.1999
ADMISSIBLE Henkel KGaA VTP (Patente) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 18.06.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.09.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.02.2003 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 27.02.2003 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2003/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.08.1998 | BE | 05.08.1998 | CH | 05.08.1998 | LI | 05.08.1998 | NL | 05.08.1998 | DK | 05.11.1998 | SE | 05.11.1998 | ES | 05.03.2002 | DE | 01.10.2002 | [2004/28] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 05.08.1998 | |
BE | 05.08.1998 | ||
CH | 05.08.1998 | ||
LI | 05.08.1998 | ||
NL | 05.08.1998 | ||
DK | 05.11.1998 | ||
SE | 05.11.1998 | ||
DE | 01.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 05.08.1998 | |
BE | 05.08.1998 | ||
CH | 05.08.1998 | ||
LI | 05.08.1998 | ||
NL | 05.08.1998 | ||
SE | 05.11.1998 | ||
DE | 01.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 05.08.1998 | |
BE | 05.08.1998 | ||
CH | 05.08.1998 | ||
LI | 05.08.1998 | ||
NL | 05.08.1998 | ||
SE | 05.11.1998 | ||
Former [2000/17] | AT | 05.08.1998 | |
BE | 05.08.1998 | ||
CH | 05.08.1998 | ||
LI | 05.08.1998 | ||
SE | 05.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | AT | 05.08.1998 | |
BE | 05.08.1998 | ||
SE | 05.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | AT | 05.08.1998 | |
BE | 05.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | AT | 05.08.1998 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2531260 (KLINKE DESITIN WERK) [X] 1 * page 5 - page 6; examples 1,2 *; | [A]GB2206048 (BOOTS CO PLC) [A] 1-9 * page 6; example 1 *; | [DA]US4900542 (PARROTTA JR UMBERTO V [US], et al) [DA] 1-9* column 4; example 6 *; | [A]US5162378 (GUTHAUSER BERNADETTE [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 7; example 1 *; | [A]US5176898 (GOLDBERG MARVIN E [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 5; example 4 * |