EP0642718 - CONTROL OF A RADIO COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2000 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/49] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON 126 25 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1995/11] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON S-126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGSTRÖM, Ulf, Erling Riddarstigen 20 S-183 30 Täby / SE | [1995/11] | Representative(s) | Norin, Klas, et al Ericsson AB Patent Unit Service Layer & Multimedia Torhamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Norin, Klas, et al Ericsson AB Patent Unit Service Layer & Multimedia Torhamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1998/29] | Norin, Klas, et al Ericsson Radio Systems AB Common Patent Department KI/ERA/JT/P 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1995/11] | Lövgren, Tage, et al Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson Patent and Trademark Department S-126 25 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 94911337.7 | 15.03.1994 | [1995/11] | WO1994SE00225 | Priority number, date | US19930036290 | 24.03.1993 Original published format: US 36290 | [1995/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9422239 | Date: | 29.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0642718 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0642718 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 29.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/005, H04B7/26, H04Q7/20 | [1999/09] | CPC: |
H04W88/08 (EP,US);
H04B7/005 (KR);
Y02D30/70 (US)
|
Former IPC [1995/11] | H04B7/005, H04B7/26, H04Q7/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, SE [1995/11] | Title | German: | STEUERUNG EINER BASISSTATION EINER FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSANLAGE | [1995/11] | English: | CONTROL OF A RADIO COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM BASE STATION | [1995/11] | French: | REGULATION D'UNE STATION DE BASE D'UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATIONS RADIO | [1995/11] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.1994 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/11] | 18.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/47] | Request for further processing for: | 17.06.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 01.07.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.08.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4392225 (WORTMAN DONALD W); | [A]US4794649 (FUJIWARA RYUHEI [JP]); | [X]EP0466543 (FRANCE TELECOM [FR]); | [A]US5134714 (JANZEN JAMES D [US], et al) |