EP0684997 - ANTHRAX TOXIN FUSION PROTEINS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as represented by the SECRETARY OF THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES National Institute of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, Westwood Building, Box OTT Bethesda, MD 20892-9902 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/49] | For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as represented by the SECRETARY OF THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES National Institute of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, Westwood Building, Box OTT Bethesda, MD 20892-9902 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEPPLA, Stephen H. 5612 Alta Vista Road Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | 02 /
KLIMPEL, Kurt 23816 Woodfield Road Gaithersburg, MD 20882 / US | 03 /
ARORA, Naveen G 110 Ashok Vihar, Phase I Delhi 110052 / IN | 04 /
SINGH, Yogendra, SCIR Center for Biochemicals University of Delhi, Mall Road Delhi 110007 / IN | [1998/34] |
Former [1995/49] | 01 /
LEPPLA, Stephen H. 5612 Alta Vista Road Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | ||
02 /
KLIMPEL, Kurt 23816 Woodfield Road Gaithersburg, MD 20882 / US | |||
03 /
ARORA, Naveen G 110 Ashok Vihar, Phase I Delhi 110052 / IN | |||
04 /
SINGH, Yogendra, SCIR Center for Biochemicals University of Delhi, Mall Road Delhi 110007 / IN | |||
05 /
NICHOLS, Peter J., 40 Axminster Crecent Welling Kent DA16 1HG / GB | Representative(s) | Thomson, Paul Anthony, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/49] | Thomson, Paul Anthony, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 94911385.6 | 14.02.1994 | [1995/49] | WO1994US01624 | Priority number, date | US19930021601 | 12.02.1993 Original published format: US 21601 | US19930082849 | 25.06.1993 Original published format: US 82849 | [1995/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9418332 | Date: | 18.08.1994 | [1994/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0684997 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0684997 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/62, C12N15/85, C12N15/32, C07K14/00, A61K39/02, A61K38/00 | [1998/34] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
A61K47/6425 (EP,US);
C07K14/21 (EP,US);
C07K14/32 (EP,US);
C07K16/00 (EP,US);
C07K19/00 (EP,US);
C12N15/62 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/77 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/55 (EP,US);
C12N2740/13022 (EP,US);
C12N2740/16222 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1995/49] | C12N15/62, C12N15/85, C12N15/32, C07K13/00, A61K39/02, A61K37/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/49] | Title | German: | ANTHRAX-TOXIN-FUSIONSPROTEINE UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN | [1995/49] | English: | ANTHRAX TOXIN FUSION PROTEINS AND USES THEREOF | [1995/49] | French: | PROTEINES DE FUSION DE LA TOXINE DU BACILLE DU CHARBON ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [1995/49] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/49] | 07.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 19.08.1998 | DK | 19.11.1998 | PT | 19.11.1998 | [2003/45] |
Former [2001/23] | GR | 19.08.1998 | |
PT | 19.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/29] | PT | 19.11.1998 | Cited in | International search | [X] - NAVEEN ARORA ET AL., "Fusions of anthrax toxin lethal factor to the ADP-ribosylation domain of Pseudomonas exotoxin A are potent cytotoxins which are translocated to the cytosol of mammalian cells", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, BALTIMORE, MD US, (19920805), vol. 267, no. 22, pages 15542 - 15548 [X] 1-3,8-10 * abstract * * page 15542, column R, paragraph L - page 15543, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 15544, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 15547, column R, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * | [X] - N. ARORA ET AL., "Potent hybrid cytotoxins of anrhrax lethal factor and the ADP-ribosylation domain of Pseudomonas exotoxin A are translocated directly to the cytosol of mammalian cells", ABSTRACTS OF THE GENERAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON US, (1992), page 31 [X] 1-3,8-10 * see abstract n. B-33 * | [A] - ANGEL CATALDI ET AL., "Regulation of pag gene expression in Bacillus anthracis: Use of a pag-lacZ transcriptional fusion", FEMS MICROBIOLOGY LETTERS, (19921101), vol. 98, no. 1-3, pages 89 - 94 [A] 11,15-17 * page 89, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 90, column L, paragraph L * * page 90, column R, paragraph 4 * | [A] - KURT R. KLIMPEL ET AL., "Anthrax toxin protective antigen is activated by a cell surface protease with the sequence specificity and catalytic properties of furin", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA., WASHINGTON US, (19921101), vol. 89, no. 21, pages 10277 - 10281 [A] 32,38 * abstract * * page 10278, column R, paragraph 2 - page 10279, column L, paragraph 3 * * page 10280, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 3 * | [PX] - NAVEEN ARORA ET AL., "Residues 1-254 of anthrax toxin lethal factor are sufficient to cause cellular uptake of fused polypeptides", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, BALTIMORE, MD US, (19930215), vol. 268, no. 5, pages 3334 - 3341 [PX] 1-3,8-10 * abstract * * page 3335, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 3336, column L, paragraph L - column R, paragraph 2 * * page 3336, column R, paragraph 5 - page 3337, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 3340, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 3340, column R, paragraph 2 - page 3341, column L, paragraph 1 * | [PX] - KURT R. KLIMPEL ET AL., "Modified anthrax toxin is cleaved and activated by HIV-1 protease", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 18B, page 163 [PX] 32-41 * see abstract n. J 515 * | by applicant | - YOKOTA ET AL., CANCER RES, (1992), vol. 52, page 3402 | - COLCHER ET AL., NATL.CANCER INST., (1990), vol. 82, page 1191 | - MILENIC ET AL., CANCER RES., (1991), vol. 51, page 6363 | - HUSTON ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1991), vol. 203, page 46 | - JOHNSON, S.; BIRD, R. E., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1991), vol. 203, page 88 | - BLAUSTEIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1989), vol. 86, pages 2209 - 2213 | - KOEHLER, T. M.; COLLIER, R.J., MOL. MICROBIOL., (1991), vol. 5, pages 1501 - 1506 | - FRIEDLANDER, A. M., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1986), vol. 261, pages 7123 - 7126 | - GORDON ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 264, pages 14792 - 14796 | - GORDON ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (1988), vol. 56, pages 1066 - 1069 | - LEPPLA, S. H., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1982), vol. 79, pages 3162 - 3166 | - P. MIKESELL ET AL., "Evidence for plasmid-mediated toxin production in Bacillus anthracis", INFECT. IMMUN., (1983), vol. 39, pages 371 - 376 | US19930042745 |