EP0691987 - CYCLIC COMPOUNDS USEFUL AS INHIBITORS OF PLATELET GLYCOPROTEIN IIb/IIIa [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Pharma Company Route 206 & Provinceline Road Princeton NJ 08543-4000 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Pharma Company Route 206 & Provinceline Road Princeton, New Jersey 08543-4000 / US | ||
Former [1999/30] | For all designated states Dupont Pharmaceuticals Company Chestnut Run Plaza, 974 Centre Road Wilmington, DE 19805 / US | ||
Former [1999/20] | For all designated states Dupont Pharmaceuticals Company Chestnut Run Plaza 974 Cenre Road Wilmington, Del. 19805 / US | ||
Former [1996/03] | For all designated states THE DU PONT MERCK PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEGRADO, William Frank 502 Bancroft Road Moylan, PA 19063-4207 / US | 02 /
JACKSON, Sharon Anne 46 Balmoral Drive Chadds Ford, PA 19317 / US | 03 /
MOUSA, Shaker Ahmed 4 Linden Circle Lincoln University, PA 19352-8933 / US | 04 /
PARTHASARATHY, Anju 423 Sterling Avenue New Castle, DE 19720 / US | 05 /
SWORIN, Michael 19 Mary Ella Drive Newark, DE 19711-5679 / US | 06 /
RAFALSKI, Maria 2028 Longcome Drive Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | [1996/03] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1996/03] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) D-50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 94911703.0 | 28.03.1994 | [1996/03] | WO1994US03223 | Priority number, date | US19930038448 | 29.03.1993 Original published format: US 38448 | [1996/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9422910 | Date: | 13.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0691987 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/12, C07K7/56, A61K37/02 | [1996/03] | CPC: |
A61P7/02 (EP);
C07K14/75 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/03] | Title | German: | ZYKLISCHE VERBINDUNGEN ALS INHIBITOREN DES PLATELET-GLYKOPROTEINS IIB/IIIA | [1996/03] | English: | CYCLIC COMPOUNDS USEFUL AS INHIBITORS OF PLATELET GLYCOPROTEIN IIb/IIIa | [1996/03] | French: | COMPOSES CYCLIQUES INHIBITEURS DE LA GLYCOPROTEINE PLAQUETTAIRE IIb/IIIa | [1996/03] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.1995 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.09.1995 | Examination requested [1996/03] | 27.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 23.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO9307170 (DU PONT MERCK PHARMA [US]) [PX] 12-25 * claims 1-9,12-34 *; | [Y]EP0425212 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US]) [Y] 12-25 * claim 1; pages 3-4 *; | [Y]WO9101331 (GENENTECH INC [US]) [Y] 12-25 * claims 1-4,39-48,59; pages 1-3 *; | [A]WO9002750 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR]) [A] 12-25 * claims * |