EP0691948 - PROTECTING GROUP FOR USE IN OLIGODEOXYRIBONUCLEOTIDE SYNTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2000 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laporte PLC 3 Bedford Stuare London WC1B 3RA / GB | [1996/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMAGE, Robert 26 Craigleith View Ravelston Edinburgh EH4 3TZ / GB | [1996/03] | Representative(s) | ffrench-Lynch, Cecil, et al Castles 17 Landsdowne Road Croydon Surrey CRO 2BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | ffrench-Lynch, Cecil, et al Castle International, Canterbury House, 2-6 Sydenham Road Croydon, Surrey CRO 9XE / GB | ||
Former [1997/31] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1996/03] | Green, Mark Charles Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 94912007.5 | 29.03.1994 | [1996/03] | WO1994GB00656 | Priority number, date | GB19930007014 | 02.04.1993 Original published format: GB 9307014 | [1996/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9422802 | Date: | 13.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0691948 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0691948 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07C43/21, C07C22/04, C07H21/00, C07C33/34 | [1996/03] | CPC: |
C07H19/06 (EP,US);
C07C22/04 (EP,US);
C07C33/34 (EP,US);
C07C43/225 (EP,US);
C07C43/23 (EP,US);
C07H21/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/03] | Title | German: | SCHUTZGRUPPE ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER OLIGODEOXYRIBONUCLEOTIDSYNTHESE | [1996/03] | English: | PROTECTING GROUP FOR USE IN OLIGODEOXYRIBONUCLEOTIDE SYNTHESIS | [1996/03] | French: | GROUPE DE PROTECTION S'APPLIQUANT A LA SYNTHESE OLIGODESOXYRIBONUCLEOTIDIQUE | [1996/03] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.08.1995 | Examination requested [1996/03] | 15.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.02.2000 | BE | 16.02.2000 | ES | 16.02.2000 | FR | 16.02.2000 | GR | 16.02.2000 | IT | 16.02.2000 | NL | 16.02.2000 | IE | 29.03.2000 | LU | 29.03.2000 | DK | 16.05.2000 | PT | 16.05.2000 | MC | 30.09.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 16.02.2000 | |
BE | 16.02.2000 | ||
ES | 16.02.2000 | ||
FR | 16.02.2000 | ||
GR | 16.02.2000 | ||
NL | 16.02.2000 | ||
IE | 29.03.2000 | ||
LU | 29.03.2000 | ||
DK | 16.05.2000 | ||
PT | 16.05.2000 | ||
MC | 30.09.2000 | ||
Former [2004/35] | AT | 16.02.2000 | |
BE | 16.02.2000 | ||
ES | 16.02.2000 | ||
FR | 16.02.2000 | ||
GR | 16.02.2000 | ||
NL | 16.02.2000 | ||
IE | 29.03.2000 | ||
DK | 16.05.2000 | ||
PT | 16.05.2000 | ||
MC | 30.09.2000 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 16.02.2000 | |
BE | 16.02.2000 | ||
ES | 16.02.2000 | ||
GR | 16.02.2000 | ||
NL | 16.02.2000 | ||
IE | 29.03.2000 | ||
DK | 16.05.2000 | ||
PT | 16.05.2000 | ||
FR | 13.07.2000 | ||
MC | 30.09.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 16.02.2000 | |
BE | 16.02.2000 | ||
ES | 16.02.2000 | ||
NL | 16.02.2000 | ||
IE | 29.03.2000 | ||
DK | 16.05.2000 | ||
PT | 16.05.2000 | ||
FR | 13.07.2000 | ||
MC | 30.09.2000 | ||
Former [2003/18] | AT | 16.02.2000 | |
BE | 16.02.2000 | ||
ES | 16.02.2000 | ||
NL | 16.02.2000 | ||
IE | 29.03.2000 | ||
PT | 16.05.2000 | ||
FR | 13.07.2000 | ||
MC | 30.09.2000 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 16.02.2000 | |
BE | 16.02.2000 | ||
ES | 16.02.2000 | ||
NL | 16.02.2000 | ||
IE | 29.03.2000 | ||
MC | 16.04.2000 | ||
PT | 16.05.2000 | ||
FR | 13.07.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 16.02.2000 | |
BE | 16.02.2000 | ||
ES | 16.02.2000 | ||
NL | 16.02.2000 | ||
IE | 29.03.2000 | ||
PT | 16.05.2000 | ||
FR | 13.07.2000 | ||
MC | 30.09.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 16.02.2000 | |
BE | 16.02.2000 | ||
ES | 16.02.2000 | ||
IE | 29.03.2000 | ||
PT | 16.05.2000 | ||
FR | 13.07.2000 | ||
MC | 30.09.2000 | ||
Former [2001/50] | AT | 16.02.2000 | |
BE | 16.02.2000 | ||
IE | 29.03.2000 | ||
PT | 16.05.2000 | ||
FR | 13.07.2000 | ||
MC | 30.09.2000 | ||
Former [2001/24] | AT | 16.02.2000 | |
BE | 16.02.2000 | ||
PT | 16.05.2000 | ||
FR | 13.07.2000 | ||
MC | 30.09.2000 | ||
Former [2001/16] | AT | 16.02.2000 | |
BE | 16.02.2000 | ||
PT | 16.05.2000 | ||
FR | 13.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | AT | 16.02.2000 | |
BE | 16.02.2000 | ||
PT | 16.05.2000 | ||
Former [2001/08] | AT | 16.02.2000 | |
BE | 16.02.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9209615 (PHARMACIA LKB BIOTECH [SE]) [A] 1-13* example 8 *; | [DA]GB2251242 (RAMAGE ROBERT, et al) [DA] 1-13 * the whole document * | [PX] - R. RAMAGE, F.O. WAHL, TETRAHEDRON. LETT., (1993), vol. 34, pages 7133 - 6 [PX] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - E. HAPP, S. HAPP, "New trityl-based protecting groups with a mild two-step removal", NUCLEOSIDES & NUCLEOTIDES, (1988), vol. 7, pages 813 - 6 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |