EP0695160 - BABY'S DUMMY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.07.1999 [1999/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAM BABYARTIKEL GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H. Degengasse 70 A-1160 Wien / AT | [1996/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RÖHRIG, Peter Himmelschlüsselweg 3a A-1160 Wien / AT | [1996/06] | Representative(s) | Weinzinger, Arnulf, et al Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/06] | Weinzinger, Arnulf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Sonn, Pawloy, Weinzinger & Wolfram Riemergasse 14 A-1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 94912403.6 | 13.04.1994 | [1996/06] | WO1994AT00043 | Priority number, date | AT19930000786 | 21.04.1993 Original published format: AT 78693 | [1996/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9423686 | Date: | 27.10.1994 | [1994/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0695160 | Date: | 07.02.1996 | [1996/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0695160 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61J17/02, A61J17/00 | [1996/06] | CPC: |
A61J17/001 (EP,US);
A61J17/02 (EP,US);
A61J17/105 (EP,US);
A61J2200/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/06] | Title | German: | BERUHIGUNGSSAUGER | [1996/06] | English: | BABY'S DUMMY | [1996/06] | French: | SUCETTE POUR BEBE | [1996/06] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.1995 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.10.1995 | Examination requested [1996/06] | 26.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3316824 (MAPA GMBH GUMMI PLASTIKWERKE [DE]) [A] 1-4,6,7,12,13 * page 17, line 26 - line 30 * * page 18, line 1 - line 3 * * page 18, line 26 - line 30 * * page 20, line 1 - line 10 * * page 20, line 24 - line 29; figures 2,5-7,9 *; | [A]DE1287253 (GUMMIWARENFABRIK CARL PLAAT) [A] 1 * column 2, line 3 - line 15; figure 3 *; | [AD]DE9213576U (MAPA) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]AT379508B (MAM BABYARTIKEL [AT]) [AD] 1 * the whole document * |