EP0704009 - PROTECTIVE STRUCTURE AND PROCESS FOR ITS PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lederbauer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Dominikanerbastei 6/8 A-1010 Wien / AT | [1996/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/14] | Representative(s) | Wildhack, Helmut Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte OG Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50 1030 Wien / AT | [2009/31] |
Former [1996/14] | Wildhack, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Leo Brauneiss, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Helmut Wildhack, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Gerhard Jellinek, Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50 A-1031 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 94912407.7 | 15.04.1994 | [1996/14] | WO1994AT00047 | Priority number, date | AT19930000762 | 16.04.1993 Original published format: AT 76293 | [1996/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9424372 | Date: | 27.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0704009 | Date: | 03.04.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0704009 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | E01F8/00 | [1996/14] | CPC: |
E01F8/027 (EP);
E01F15/086 (EP);
F24S10/00 (EP);
F24T10/00 (EP);
Y02E10/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/14] | Title | German: | SCHUTZAUFBAU UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [1996/14] | English: | PROTECTIVE STRUCTURE AND PROCESS FOR ITS PRODUCTION | [1996/14] | French: | STRUCTURE DE PROTECTION ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1996/14] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/17] | 04.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 22.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/12] | Request for further processing for: | 22.12.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 22.12.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.01.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.11.1995 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   28.12.1995 | 20.11.1995 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   28.12.1995 | 20.11.1995 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   28.12.1995 | 20.11.1995 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   28.12.1995 | 20.11.1995 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   28.12.1995 | 20.11.1995 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   28.12.1995 | 20.11.1995 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   28.12.1995 | 20.11.1995 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   28.12.1995 | 20.11.1995 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   28.12.1995 | 20.11.1995 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   28.12.1995 | 20.11.1995 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   28.12.1995 | 20.11.1995 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   28.12.1995 | 20.11.1995 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   28.12.1995 | 20.11.1995 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   28.12.1995 | 20.11.1995 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   28.12.1995 | 20.11.1995 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   28.12.1995 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 24.01.1996 | M01   Fee paid on   31.01.1996 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1997 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.10.1997 | 30.04.1998 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 31.03.1999 | FR | 31.03.1999 | GB | 31.03.1999 | GR | 31.03.1999 | IE | 31.03.1999 | NL | 31.03.1999 | SE | 31.03.1999 | AT | 15.04.1999 | LU | 15.04.1999 | BE | 30.04.1999 | CH | 30.04.1999 | LI | 30.04.1999 | DK | 30.06.1999 | PT | 30.06.1999 | MC | 31.10.1999 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/45] | ES | 31.03.1999 | |
FR | 31.03.1999 | ||
GB | 31.03.1999 | ||
GR | 31.03.1999 | ||
IE | 31.03.1999 | ||
NL | 31.03.1999 | ||
SE | 31.03.1999 | ||
AT | 15.04.1999 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
CH | 30.04.1999 | ||
LI | 30.04.1999 | ||
DK | 30.06.1999 | ||
PT | 30.06.1999 | ||
MC | 31.10.1999 | ||
Former [2003/18] | ES | 31.03.1999 | |
FR | 31.03.1999 | ||
GB | 31.03.1999 | ||
GR | 31.03.1999 | ||
IE | 31.03.1999 | ||
NL | 31.03.1999 | ||
SE | 31.03.1999 | ||
AT | 15.04.1999 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
CH | 30.04.1999 | ||
LI | 30.04.1999 | ||
PT | 30.06.1999 | ||
MC | 31.10.1999 | ||
Former [2003/17] | ES | 31.03.1999 | |
FR | 31.03.1999 | ||
GB | 31.03.1999 | ||
GR | 31.03.1999 | ||
IE | 31.03.1999 | ||
NL | 31.03.1999 | ||
SE | 31.03.1999 | ||
AT | 15.04.1999 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
CH | 30.04.1999 | ||
LI | 30.04.1999 | ||
MC | 31.05.1999 | ||
PT | 30.06.1999 | ||
Former [2002/32] | ES | 31.03.1999 | |
FR | 31.03.1999 | ||
GB | 31.03.1999 | ||
GR | 31.03.1999 | ||
IE | 31.03.1999 | ||
NL | 31.03.1999 | ||
SE | 31.03.1999 | ||
AT | 15.04.1999 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
CH | 30.04.1999 | ||
LI | 30.04.1999 | ||
PT | 30.06.1999 | ||
MC | 31.10.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 31.03.1999 | |
GB | 31.03.1999 | ||
GR | 31.03.1999 | ||
IE | 31.03.1999 | ||
NL | 31.03.1999 | ||
SE | 31.03.1999 | ||
AT | 15.04.1999 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
CH | 30.04.1999 | ||
LI | 30.04.1999 | ||
PT | 30.06.1999 | ||
MC | 31.10.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | GB | 31.03.1999 | |
GR | 31.03.1999 | ||
IE | 31.03.1999 | ||
NL | 31.03.1999 | ||
SE | 31.03.1999 | ||
AT | 15.04.1999 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
CH | 30.04.1999 | ||
LI | 30.04.1999 | ||
PT | 30.06.1999 | ||
MC | 31.10.1999 | ||
Former [2002/12] | GB | 31.03.1999 | |
GR | 31.03.1999 | ||
IE | 31.03.1999 | ||
NL | 31.03.1999 | ||
AT | 15.04.1999 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
CH | 30.04.1999 | ||
LI | 30.04.1999 | ||
PT | 30.06.1999 | ||
MC | 31.10.1999 | ||
Former [2002/10] | GB | 31.03.1999 | |
GR | 31.03.1999 | ||
NL | 31.03.1999 | ||
AT | 15.04.1999 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
CH | 30.04.1999 | ||
LI | 30.04.1999 | ||
PT | 30.06.1999 | ||
MC | 31.10.1999 | ||
IE | 06.12.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | GB | 31.03.1999 | |
GR | 31.03.1999 | ||
IE | 31.03.1999 | ||
NL | 31.03.1999 | ||
AT | 15.04.1999 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
CH | 30.04.1999 | ||
LI | 30.04.1999 | ||
PT | 30.06.1999 | ||
MC | 31.10.1999 | ||
Former [2001/08] | GB | 31.03.1999 | |
IE | 31.03.1999 | ||
NL | 31.03.1999 | ||
AT | 15.04.1999 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
CH | 30.04.1999 | ||
LI | 30.04.1999 | ||
PT | 30.06.1999 | ||
MC | 31.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | GB | 31.03.1999 | |
IE | 31.03.1999 | ||
NL | 31.03.1999 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
CH | 30.04.1999 | ||
LI | 30.04.1999 | ||
PT | 30.06.1999 | ||
MC | 31.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | GB | 31.03.1999 | |
IE | 31.03.1999 | ||
NL | 31.03.1999 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
PT | 30.06.1999 | ||
MC | 31.10.1999 | ||
CH | 20.11.1999 | ||
LI | 20.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/27] | GB | 31.03.1999 | |
IE | 31.03.1999 | ||
NL | 31.03.1999 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
PT | 30.06.1999 | ||
MC | 31.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/25] | GB | 31.03.1999 | |
NL | 31.03.1999 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
PT | 30.06.1999 | ||
MC | 31.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | GB | 31.03.1999 | |
NL | 31.03.1999 | ||
BE | 30.04.1999 | ||
PT | 30.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | GB | 31.03.1999 | |
NL | 31.03.1999 | ||
PT | 30.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/03] | GB | 31.03.1999 | |
NL | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [1999/36] | NL | 31.03.1999 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE7739201U (P. SCHRAUDENBACH) [Y] 42 * abstract *; | [A]DE3004102 (KUEHNHENRICH PAUL H) [A] 1,29 * page 3, line 23 - page 5, line 13; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0100374 (RACK DAVID) [Y] 1-4,7,8,10-13,15-19,21,22,25,26,31-33,35,37-39,42,46,47,50,51,53-55 * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 6 * * page 8, line 9 - line 20; figure - *; | [Y]DE3512066 (NAEGELE & CO BAU [AT]) [Y] 35 * page 9, paragraph 2; figure 5 *; | [DY]WO8702399 (GASSER & CO [AT]) [DY] 1-4,7,8,10-13,15-19,21,22,25,26,31-33,35,37-39,42,46,47,50,51,53-55 * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 3 * * page 6, line 9 - line 30 * * page 7, line 14 - line 24 * * page 8, line 19 - page 9, line 27 * * page 10, line 8 - line 23 * * page 12, line 26 - page 13, line 9 * * page 14, line 32 - line 34 * * page 15, line 3 - line 6; figure - *; | [Y]EP0265419 (REEDAL ENTWICK & LIZENZ GMBH [DE]) [Y] 25,38 * column 2, line 51 - line 55; figure - *; | [A]EP0294778 (MAST GARTEN LANDSCHAFTSBAU KG [DE]) [A] 3,4,7 * column 4, line 6 - column 6, line 3; figure - *; | [YA]DE3734411 (UNTERLAENDER JUERGEN DIPL ING [DE]) [Y] 4,11-13,26,33 * figure - * [A] 1,2,10,15; | [YA]EP0319512 (HARTL WENZL BAU [AT]) [Y] 8 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,7,10,15,26,32; | [Y]JPH01226908 (TOYO JITSUGYO KK); | [Y]DE4030270 (UNTERLAENDER ROSWITHA [DE]) [Y] 50,53 * column 1, line 39 - line 45; figure 13 *; | [Y]DE4040583 (AEI GES FUER AUTOMATIK ELEKTRO [DE]) [Y] 18 * column 1, line 1 - line 42; figure . *; | [A]DE4119355 (UNTERLAENDER ROSWITHA [DE]) [A] 1,32* the whole document *; | [Y]EP0534346 (OEKUSTIK LAERMSCHUTZWAND GMBH [DE]) [Y] 16,39 * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 5; figures 4,5 *; | [Y] - LÜFT, "LUFT-Pflanzenwand", BAUAUSSTELLUNG, MÜNCHEN, (199005), pages 1 - 2, XP000319422 [Y] 10 | [Y] - SPITS P.L., "met beton hoor je een stuk minder van wegverkeer", LAND+WATER, OISTERWIJK NL, (199108), vol. 31, no. 7/8, pages 36 - 39, XP000233097 [Y] 54 * figure 1 * |