EP0650339 - SLIDE MECHANISM FOR A DRAWER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.11.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PAUL HETTICH GMBH & CO. Vahrenkampstrasse 12-16 D-32278 Kirchlengern / DE | [1995/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHRÖDER, Gerhard Worthgarten 2 D-32549 Bad Oeynhausen / DE | 02 /
NOSKE, Frank Poppensiek 7 D-32584 Löhne / DE | 03 /
RUSH, Gordon Bohlenweg 1a D-32659 Lemgo / DE | [1995/18] | Representative(s) | Stracke, Alexander, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2008/33] |
Former [1995/18] | Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. A. Stracke Dipl.-Ing. K.O. Loesenbeck Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 Postfach 10 18 82 D-33518 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 94913025.6 | 26.04.1994 | [1995/18] | WO1994DE00473 | Priority number, date | DE19930007088U | 12.05.1993 Original published format: DE 9307088 U | [1995/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9426146 | Date: | 24.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0650339 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0650339 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A47B88/04 | [1995/18] | CPC: |
A47B88/493 (EP,US);
A47B88/00 (KR);
A47B2210/0032 (EP,US);
A47B2210/0035 (EP,US);
A47B2210/004 (EP,US);
A47B2210/0059 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT [1996/47] |
Former [1995/18] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | AUSZUGFÜHRUNG FÜR EINEN SCHUBKASTEN | [1995/18] | English: | SLIDE MECHANISM FOR A DRAWER | [1995/18] | French: | GUIDE PERMETTANT D'OUVRIR ET DE FERMER UN TIROIR | [1995/18] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/18] | 10.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 26.04.1997 | CH | 30.04.1997 | LI | 30.04.1997 | [2014/38] |
Former [2008/29] | PT | 26.04.1997 | |
CH | 30.04.1997 | ||
LI | 30.04.1997 | ||
Former [1998/43] | CH | 30.04.1997 | |
LI | 30.04.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0226389 (JACKSON PAUL ADRIAN SOUTHON [GB], et al) [A] 1-5* page 1 - page 2; figures 1-3 * |