Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0698192
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
17.11.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2001 [2001/01] |
30.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2000 [2000/07] |
17.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] |
20.02.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] |
24.10.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.1997 [1997/50] |
10.10.1997 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.11.1997 [1997/48] |
07.03.1997 |
Change - applicant |
published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] |
07.03.1997 |
Change - inventor |
published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] |
18.10.1996 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.12.1996 [1996/49] |
14.09.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.06.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.04.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
15.03.1996 |
First examination report |
|
13.03.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
12.01.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.02.1996 [1996/09] |
12.01.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.02.1996 [1996/09] |
09.01.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.01.1996 |
Change - extension states |
|