Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6535494 | Global Dossier | 08.11.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | DK43793 | 19.04.1993 | DK9400156 | 19.04.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0698192 | Global Dossier | 04.12.1996 | B1 | EP0698192 | 28.02.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DK43793 | 19.04.1993 | DK9400156 | 19.04.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69401065T | 19.06.1997 | T2 | DE69401065D1 | 16.01.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DK43793 | 19.04.1993 | DK9400156 | 19.04.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI954948 | 17.11.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | DK43793 | 19.04.1993 | DK9400156 | 19.04.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO954160L | 18.12.1995 | L | NO954160D0 | 18.10.1995 | D0 | Priority number | Date | DK43793 | 19.04.1993 | DK9400156 | 19.04.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL174018B | 30.06.1998 | B1 | PL311197 | 05.02.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DK43793 | 19.04.1993 | DK9400156 | 19.04.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SK128395 | 03.04.1996 | A3 | Priority number | Date | DK43793 | 19.04.1993 | DK9400156 | 19.04.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9424475 | Global Dossier | 27.10.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DK43793 | 19.04.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE145978T | 15.12.1996 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DK43793 | 19.04.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ272195 | 17.04.1996 | A3 | Priority number | Date | DK43793 | 19.04.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK170882B | 26.02.1996 | B1 | DK43793 | 20.10.1994 | A | DK43793D0 | 19.04.1993 | D0 | Priority number | Date | DK43793 | 19.04.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2100059T | 01.06.1997 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DK43793 | 19.04.1993 |