EP0698192 - A PIPE COUPLING AND A METHOD OF USING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2000 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 03.01.2001 [2001/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LINTECH A/S Fabriksvangen 17 3550 Slangerup / DK | [1997/17] |
Former [1996/09] | For all designated states LINDHARDT, Ole Bakkegardsvej 6, Huseby DK-3200 Helsinge / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lindhardt, Ole Bakkegardsvej 6, Huseby 3200 Helsinge / DK | [1997/17] |
Former [1996/09] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Wittrup, Flemming, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1996/09] | WITTRUP, Flemming, et al c/o Hofman-Bang & Boutard A/S Adelgade 15 DK-1304 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 94913047.0 | 19.04.1994 | [1996/09] | WO1994DK00156 | Priority number, date | DK19930000437 | 19.04.1993 Original published format: DK 43793 | [1996/09] | Filing language | DA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9424475 | Date: | 27.10.1994 | [1994/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0698192 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0698192 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/06, F16L13/14 | [1996/09] | CPC: |
F16L37/06 (EP);
F16L17/00 (EP);
F16L47/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/09] | Extension states | SI | 09.11.1995 | Title | German: | ROHRKUPPLUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER VERWENDUNG | [1996/49] | English: | A PIPE COUPLING AND A METHOD OF USING IT | [1996/09] | French: | RACCORD DE TUYAU ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION | [1996/09] |
Former [1996/09] | ROHRKUPPLUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER VERVENDUNG | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.1994 | Translation filed | 09.11.1995 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/09] | 15.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 04.12.1996 | GR | 04.12.1996 | PT | 04.03.1997 | IE | 19.04.1997 | LU | 30.04.1997 | [2001/01] |
Former [2000/05] | DK | 04.12.1996 | |
GR | 04.12.1996 | ||
PT | 04.03.1997 | ||
LU | 30.04.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 04.12.1996 | |
PT | 04.03.1997 | ||
Former [1997/50] | PT | 04.03.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]SE425515 (METALFORM SAFESET AB [SE]); | [A]DE3407467 (VILLAMOS IPARI KUTATO INTEZET [HU], et al); | [X]EP0122099 (BIG INCH MARINE SYST [US]); | [A]FR2622272 (CLEMESSY SA [FR]); | [A]EP0338164 (CAMERON IRON WORKS INC [US]) |