EP0694241 - ADAPTIVE VIDEO DECOMPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.04.2003 [2003/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Media 100, Inc. 290 Donald Lynch Boulevard Marlboro, MA 01752 / US | [1998/04] |
Former [1996/05] | For all designated states DATA TRANSLATION, INC. 100 Locke Drive Marlboro, MA 01752-1192 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARDIMAN, James, M. 21A Lovell Street Mendon, MA 01756 / US | [1996/05] | Representative(s) | Heusler, Wolfgang, et al V. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | Heusler, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Dr. Dieter von Bezold Dipl.-Ing. Peter Schütz Dipl.-Ing. Wolfgang Heusler Brienner Strasse 52 D-80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94913904.2 | 15.03.1994 | [1996/05] | WO1994US02758 | Priority number, date | US19930048782 | 16.04.1993 Original published format: US 48782 | [1996/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9424809 | Date: | 27.10.1994 | [1994/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0694241 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.10.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/13 | [1996/20] | CPC: |
G06F3/14 (EP,US);
H04N19/124 (EP,US);
H04N19/16 (EP,US);
H04N19/42 (EP,US);
H04N19/423 (EP,US);
H04N19/44 (EP,US);
H04N19/46 (EP,US);
H04N19/60 (EP,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H04N21/4135 (EP,US);
H04N21/4143 (EP,US);
H04N21/426 (EP,US);
H04N21/4348 (EP,US);
H04N21/43632 (EP,US);
H04N21/440254 (EP,US);
H04N21/443 (EP,US);
G09G2340/02 (EP,US);
H04N19/146 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1996/05] | H04N1/415, G06F13/00, G10L5/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/05] | Title | German: | ADAPTIVE VIDEOKOMPRESSION | [1996/05] | English: | ADAPTIVE VIDEO DECOMPRESSION | [1996/05] | French: | DECOMPRESSION VIDEO ADAPTATIVE | [1996/05] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.1995 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.1995 | Search fee paid | 27.10.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.10.1995 | Examination requested [1996/05] | 01.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/17] | 20.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1999 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   23.04.1999 | 31.03.2002 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0447203 (C CUBE MICROSYSTEMS [US]) [X] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0469835 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 6,11,16 * figures 6,10,11 *; | [A]EP0469648 (AMPEX [US]) [A] 1-4,9,14 * page 5, line 12 - line 17; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0503956 (C CUBE MICROSYSTEMS [US]); | [A]EP0506294 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 5,7,10,15 * abstract *; | [A] - BOLTON M, "A COMPLETE SINGLE-CHIP IMPLEMENTATION OF THE JPEG IMAGE COMPRESSION STANDARD", PROCEEDINGS OF THE CUSTOM INTEGRATED CIRCUITS CONFERENCE, SAN DIEGO, MAY 12 - 15, 1991, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19910512), no. CONF. 13, pages 12.2.1 - 12.2.4, XP000295731 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | [A] - KAZUYA OGAWA ET AL, "A SINGLE CHIP COMPRESSION/DECOMPRESSION LSI BASED ON JPEG", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, (19920801), vol. 38, no. 3, pages 703 - 709, XP000311914 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.156758 | [A] - ACKLAND B D, "A VIDEO-CODEC CHIP SET FOR MULTIMEDIA APPLICATIONS", AT & T TECHNICAL JOURNAL, (19930101), vol. 72, no. 1, pages 50 - 66, XP000367735 | [A] - QUINNELL R A, "IC ACTS AS JPEG IMAGE-COMPRESSION COPROCESSOR", EDN ELECTRICAL DESIGN NEWS, (19930304), vol. 38, no. 5, page 68, 70, XP000349292 | International search | [Y]US4704730 (TURNER JOHN M [US], et al); | [XY]US5122875 (RAYCHAUDHURI DIPANKAR [US], et al); | [Y]US5146564 (EVANS MICHAEL B [US], et al) |