EP0702534 - MULTIPLE-PART DENTAL MATERIAL DELIVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLEISHER, Larry, D. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
MARTIN, Thomas, W. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1996/13] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/13] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94914210.3 | 19.04.1994 | [1996/13] | WO1994US04258 | Priority number, date | US19930075150 | 10.06.1993 Original published format: US 75150 | [1996/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9428820 | Date: | 22.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0702534 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0702534 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61C9/00 | [1996/13] | CPC: |
A61C5/64 (EP,US);
A61C9/0026 (EP,US);
A61K6/90 (EP,US);
B05C17/00593 (EP,US);
G01N3/12 (EP,US);
B05C17/00506 (EP,US);
B05C17/00516 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/13] | Title | German: | Abgabevorrichtung für Mehrkomponenten-Dentalmaterialien | [1998/32] | English: | MULTIPLE-PART DENTAL MATERIAL DELIVERY SYSTEM | [1996/13] | French: | SYSTEME DISTRIBUTEUR DE MATERIAU DENTAIRE EN PLUSIEURS PARTIES | [1996/13] |
Former [1996/13] | MEHRFACHTEILCHENABGABEVORRICHTUNG FÜR DENTALMATERIALIEN | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.1996 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/13] | 29.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]US5100320 (MARTIN THOMAS W [US], et al) [YD] 1-15 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 12 *; | [Y]US4801263 (CLARK WILLIAM C [US]) [Y] 1-15 * column 2, line 34 - line 42 * |