EP0701644 - POTABLE RAINWATER COLLECTING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.2002 [2002/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLARK, Kenneth George 10 Rim Road Buderim, QLD 4556 / AU | [1996/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/12] | Representative(s) | Lambert, Peter Richard, et al Lewis & Taylor 144 New Walk Leicester LE1 7JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/12] | Dearing-Lambert, Peter Richard, et al Lewis & Taylor, 144 New Walk Leicester LE1 7JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 94914273.1 | 29.04.1994 | [1996/12] | WO1994AU00224 | Priority number, date | AU1993PL08525 | 29.04.1993 Original published format: AU PL852593 | [1996/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9425691 | Date: | 10.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0701644 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0701644 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 10.11.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E03B3/00 | [1997/18] | CPC: |
E03B3/03 (EP,US);
Y02A20/00 (EP,US);
Y02A20/108 (EP,US);
Y10T137/474 (EP,US);
Y10T137/5762 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/12] | E03B3/03 | Designated contracting states | IE [1996/12] | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUM SAMMELN TRINKBAREN REGENWASSERS | [1996/12] | English: | POTABLE RAINWATER COLLECTING APPARATUS | [1996/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF SERVANT A RECUEILLIR DE L'EAU DE PLUIE POTABLE | [1996/12] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.1995 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.1995 | Search fee paid | 28.11.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 28.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/12] | 27.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2009380 (AQUAVOIR HOLDINGS CY) [A] 1,2,12 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US1647900 (CARPENTER CLIFFORD C); | [A]FR1559540 |