EP0696636 - LUBRICATING OIL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.2000 [2000/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tonen Corporation 1-1 Hitotsubashi, 1-Chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [1996/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARAI, Katsuya, Tonen Corp., Corpor. Res. & Dev.Lab 3-1, Nishitsurugaoka 1-chome, Ohi-machi Iruma-gun, Saitama 356 / JP | 02 /
TOMIZAWA, Hirotaka, Tonen Corp., Corp.Res.&Dev.Lab 3-1, Nishitsurugaoka 1-chome, Ohi-machi Iruma-gun, Saitama 356 / JP | [1996/07] | Representative(s) | Fletcher Watts, Susan J., et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd Patents and Licences Mailpoint 72 Esso House, Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | Fletcher Watts, Susan Jane, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd, Patents and Licences, Mailpoint 72, Esso House, Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | ||
Former [1999/15] | Hart, Richard Joseph, et al Esso Engineering (Europe) Ltd Patents and Licences Mailpoint 72 Esso House Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | ||
Former [1996/07] | Mansell, Keith Rodney, et al Exxon Chemical Limited European Patents and Licences Exxon Chemical Technology Centre P O Box 1 GB-Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 94914574.2 | 28.04.1994 | [1996/07] | WO1994JP00723 | Priority number, date | JP19930128049 | 30.04.1993 Original published format: JP 12804993 | [1996/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9425549 | Date: | 10.11.1994 | [1994/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0696636 | Date: | 14.02.1996 | [1996/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0696636 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.11.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C10M141/10, C10M141/08, C10M169/04, C10M171/00, C10M171/02, // (C10M141/08, 133:12, 135:18),(C10M141/10, 133:12, 137:10),(C10M169/04, 133:12, 135:18, 137:10, 139:00), C10N10:12, C10N20:00, C10N20:02, C10N30:06, C10N30:10 | [1996/30] | CPC: |
C10M169/04 (EP,US);
C10M101/02 (EP);
C10M133/12 (EP);
C10M135/18 (EP);
C10M137/10 (EP);
C10M2203/10 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1006 (EP,US);
C10M2203/102 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1025 (EP,US);
C10M2203/104 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1045 (EP,US);
C10M2203/106 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1065 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1085 (EP,US);
C10M2207/027 (EP,US);
C10M2207/028 (EP,US);
C10M2215/06 (EP,US);
C10M2215/064 (EP,US);
C10M2215/065 (EP,US);
C10M2215/066 (EP,US);
C10M2215/067 (EP,US);
C10M2215/068 (EP,US);
C10M2215/086 (EP,US);
C10M2215/22 (EP,US);
C10M2215/221 (EP,US);
C10M2215/225 (EP,US);
C10M2215/226 (EP,US);
C10M2215/28 (EP,US);
C10M2215/30 (EP,US);
C10M2219/044 (EP,US);
C10M2219/046 (EP,US);
C10M2219/066 (EP,US);
C10M2219/068 (EP,US);
C10M2223/04 (EP,US);
C10M2223/042 (EP,US);
C10M2223/045 (EP,US);
C10N2010/12 (EP,US);
C10N2040/00 (EP,US);
C10N2040/04 (EP,US);
C10N2040/042 (EP,US);
C10N2040/044 (EP,US);
C10N2040/046 (EP,US);
C10N2040/06 (EP,US);
C10N2040/08 (EP,US);
C10N2040/25 (EP,US);
C10N2040/251 (EP,US);
C10N2040/255 (EP,US);
C10N2040/28 (EP,US);
C10N2040/30 (EP,US);
C10N2040/32 (EP,US);
C10N2040/34 (EP,US);
C10N2040/36 (EP,US);
C10N2040/38 (EP,US);
C10N2040/40 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C10M169/04, C10M101/02, C10M133/12, C10M133/12, C10M135/18, C10M137/10 (US,EP);
C10M169/04, C10M101/02, C10M133/12, C10M135/18, C10M137/10 (US,EP);
C10M2215/064, C10M2215/064 (US,EP);
C10M2215/065, C10M2215/065 (EP,US);
C10M2215/066, C10M2215/066 (EP,US);
C10M2215/067, C10M2215/067 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [1996/07] | C10M169/04, C10M171/00, C10M171/02, // (C10M169/04, 133:12, 133:54, 139:00), C10N10:12, C10N20:00, C10N20:02, C10N30:06, C10N30:10, C10N40:00, C10N40:04, C10N40:25 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/07] | Title | German: | SCHMIERÖLZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [1996/07] | English: | LUBRICATING OIL COMPOSITION | [1996/07] | French: | COMPOSITION D'HUILE LUBRIFIANTE | [1996/07] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.1995 | Translation filed | 21.11.1995 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.1995 | Search fee paid | 21.11.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 21.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/12] | 20.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   14.06.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0362894 ; | [A]EP0447916 (NIPPON OIL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 5; example 1; table 1 *; | [A]WO9113955 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 6; example 1; claims 1,4,11,12 *; | [A]GB2097422 (CHEVRON RES) [A] 1 * page 1, line 3 - line 5 * * page 8; table 1 * * page 9; table 2 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 17, Database accession no. 91-122407, XP002004432 & JPH0362894 A 19910318 (TONEN CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS59122597 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD, et al); | [A]JPS63223092 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO) |