EP0699261 - SUNSHADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1999 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUTTER, Frederick L. Gattringer Strasse 83 B A-2345 Brunn am Gebirge / AT | [1996/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/10] | Representative(s) | Rippel, Andreas Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Rippel Kommandit-Partnerschaft Maxingstrasse 34 1130 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/10] | Rippel, Andreas, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Rippel Kommandit-Partnerschaft Maxingstrasse 34 A-1130 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 94915465.2 | 17.05.1994 | [1996/10] | WO1994AT00067 | Priority number, date | AT19930000984 | 19.05.1993 Original published format: AT 98493 | [1996/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9427004 | Date: | 24.11.1994 | [1994/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0699261 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0699261 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E04H15/00 | [1996/10] | CPC: |
E04H15/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/10] | Title | German: | SONNENSEGEL | [1996/10] | English: | SUNSHADE | [1996/10] | French: | TOILE DE PROTECTION CONTRE LE SOLEIL | [1996/10] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.1995 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.10.1995 | Examination requested [1996/10] | 23.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 04.11.1998 | NL | 04.11.1998 | SE | 04.11.1998 | DK | 04.02.1999 | PT | 04.02.1999 | LU | 17.05.1999 | BE | 31.05.1999 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/45] | GR | 04.11.1998 | |
NL | 04.11.1998 | ||
SE | 04.11.1998 | ||
DK | 04.02.1999 | ||
PT | 04.02.1999 | ||
BE | 31.05.1999 | ||
Former [2003/17] | GR | 04.11.1998 | |
NL | 04.11.1998 | ||
SE | 04.11.1998 | ||
PT | 04.02.1999 | ||
BE | 31.05.1999 | ||
MC | 31.05.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | GR | 04.11.1998 | |
NL | 04.11.1998 | ||
SE | 04.11.1998 | ||
PT | 04.02.1999 | ||
BE | 31.05.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | GR | 04.11.1998 | |
SE | 04.11.1998 | ||
PT | 04.02.1999 | ||
BE | 31.05.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | GR | 04.11.1998 | |
IE | 04.11.1998 | ||
PT | 04.02.1999 | ||
BE | 31.05.1999 | ||
Former [2000/27] | IE | 04.11.1998 | |
PT | 04.02.1999 | ||
BE | 31.05.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | PT | 04.02.1999 | |
BE | 31.05.1999 | ||
Former [1999/32] | PT | 04.02.1999 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB308894 (C. CLAYTON) [Y] 1 * page 1, line 50 - line 95; figure 1 *; | [Y]GB1392939 (W. FAGG) [Y] 1 * page 1, line 73 - line 90; figure . *; | [A]FR1475006 (L. WALRAVE) [A] 2 * page 1, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 2, column 1, paragraph 1; figures 4,5 *; | [A]US4506688 (W. BETHOON) [A] 1 * column 3, line 4 - line 68; figure 1 *; | [A]DE2817753 (M+G) [A] 3 * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph 1; figure 2 * |