EP0699049 - MULTICHANNEL RECORDING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.03.2000 [2000/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reynolds Medical Limited 1-2 Harforde Court, John Tate Road Hertford SG13 7HW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | For all designated states Reynolds Medical Limited 1 Harforde Court, John Tate Road Hertford SG13 7NW / GB | ||
Former [1996/10] | For all designated states NEILSON, James McEwan McIntyre 4 Whitehouse Terrace Edinburgh EH9 2EU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neilson, James McEwan McIntyre 4 Whitehouse Terrace Edinburgh EH9 2EU / GB | [1999/22] |
Former [1996/10] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Cline, Roger Ledlie EDWARD EVANS BARKER Clifford's Inn, Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/10] | Cline, Roger Ledlie EDWARD EVANS & CO. Chancery House 53-64 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 94915622.8 | 19.05.1994 | [1996/10] | WO1994GB01075 | Priority number, date | GB19930010359 | 19.05.1993 Original published format: GB 9310359 | [1996/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9426164 | Date: | 24.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0699049 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0699049 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0428, A61B5/0404 | [1996/10] | CPC: |
A61B5/332 (EP);
A61B5/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/10] | Title | German: | MEHRKANALIGES AUFZEICHNUNGSGERÄT | [1996/10] | English: | MULTICHANNEL RECORDING APPARATUS | [1996/10] | French: | APPAREIL D'ENREGISTREMENT A MULTICANAUX | [1996/10] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.1995 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/10] | 06.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.09.1998 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4367752 (JIMENEZ OSCAR, et al) [A] 1-5 * column 6, line 4 - line 54 * * column 12, line 24 - column 13, line 68 ** figures 1-3,10 *; | [XA]WO8909021 (SURVIVAL TECHNOLOGY [US]) [X] 1 * page 9, line 11 - page 10, line 10 * * page 15, line 21 - page 16, line 12 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 2-4 | Examination | US4622979 | by applicant | WO8909021 |