EP0697111 - CELL TEST FOR ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.1998 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.1998 [1998/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as represented by the SECRETARY OF THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES National Institute of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, Westwood Building, Box OTT Bethesda, MD 20892-9902 / US | For all designated states CORNELL RESEARCH FOUNDATION, INC. 20 Thornwood Drive, Suite 105 Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/08] | For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as represented by the SECRETARY OF THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES National Institute of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, Westwood Building, Box OTT Bethesda, MD 20892-9902 / US | ||
For all designated states CORNELL RESEARCH FOUNDATION, INC. 20 Thornwood Drive, Suite 105 Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALKON, Daniel, L. 6701 Bonaventure Court Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | 02 /
ETCHEBERRIGARAY, Rene 12221 Village Square Terrace Rockville, MD 20852 / US | 03 /
ETSURO, Ito 1-45-106, Minami 18-jo, Nishi 17-chome Chuo-ku Sapporo 060 / JP | 04 /
GIBSON, Gary, E. 60 Fernwood Road Larchmont, NY 10538 / US | [1996/08] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/08] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94915953.7 | 02.05.1994 | [1996/08] | WO1994US04754 | Priority number, date | US19930056456 | 03.05.1993 Original published format: US 56456 | [1996/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9425872 | Date: | 10.11.1994 | [1994/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0697111 | Date: | 21.02.1996 | [1996/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0697111 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50 | [1996/08] | CPC: |
G01N33/6872 (EP,US);
C07K14/4711 (EP,US);
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
G01N33/5091 (EP,US);
G01N33/6896 (EP,US);
G01N2800/2821 (EP,US);
Y10S436/811 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/08] | Title | German: | ZELL-TEST FÜR ALZHEIMERSCHE KRANKHEIT | [1997/30] | English: | CELL TEST FOR ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE | [1996/08] | French: | TEST EFFECTUE SUR DES CELLULES POUR DIAGNOSTIQUER LA MALADIE D'ALZHEIMER | [1996/08] |
Former [1996/08] | ZELL-TEST FÜR ALZHEINERSCHE KRANKHEIT | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/08] | 07.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8909600 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [A] 5,6,8* claim - * | [XP] - E.ITO ET AL., "A laboratory diagnosis of Alzheimer's Disease with patch-clamp and Ca2+-imaging techniques", NEUROSCIENCE RESEARCH, (199312), vol. 18, page 576 [XP] 1-21 * See abstract 615 * | [XP] - R.ETCHEBERRIGARAY ET AL., "Potassium channel dysfunction in fibroblasts identifies patients with Alzheimer disease", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES (USA), (19930901), vol. 90, no. 17, pages 8209 - 8213 [XP] 1-12 * the whole document * | [XP] - E.ITO ET AL., "Internal Ca2+ mobilization is altered in fibroblasts from patients with Alzheimer disease", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES (USA), (19940118), vol. 91, no. 2, pages 534 - 538 [XP] 13-21 * the whole document * | [A] - H-M.HUANG ET AL., "Inositol Phosphates and Intracellular calcium After Bradykinin Stimulation in Fibroblasts From Young, Normal Aged and Alzheimer Donors", NEUROBIOLOGY OF AGING, (1991), vol. 12, pages 469 - 473 [A] 13-21 * page 469 - page 470 * | [A] - A.GROSSMANN ET AL., "Intracellular calcium Response Is Reduced in CD4+ Lymphocytes in Alzheimer's Disease and in Older Persons with Down's Syndrome", NEUROBIOLOGY OF AGING, (199304), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 177 - 185 [A] 5,6,9,11,13,16,17,19,21 * page 177 - page 179 * | [AD] - B.SAKMANN ET AL., "Patch Clamp techniques for Studying Ionic Channels in Excitable Membranes", ANN. REV. PHYSIOL., (1984), vol. 46, pages 455 - 472 [AD] 1,4 * See the introduction * | [AD] - C.PETERSON ET AL., "Altered response of Fibroblasts From Aged and Alzheimer Donors to Drugs That Elevate Cytosolic Free Calcium", NEUROBIOLOGY OF AGING, (1988), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 261 - 266 [AD] 5-7,9-12 * the whole document * | [AP] - A.F.GHUYSEN-ITARD ET AL., "Loss of calcium-Homeostatic Mechanisms in Polymorphonuclear Leukocytes of demented and Nondemented Elderly Subjects", GERONTOLOGY, (199308), vol. 39, pages 163 - 169 [AP] 5-7,9-12 * the whole document * | Examination | - GERONTOLOGY, vol.39August 1993 pages 163 - 169 A.F.GHUYSEN-ITARD ET AL. 'Loss | - of calcium-Homeostatic Mechanisms in Polymorphonuclear Leukocytes of demented and Nondemented Elderly Subjects' |