EP0697816 - A PLANT AND A METHOD OF TREATING MILK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 06.07.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2001 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 22.08.2001 [2001/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APV PASILAC A/S Europaplads 2 8100 Arhus C / DK | [1998/15] |
Former [1996/09] | For all designated states APV PASILAC A/S Europaplads 2 DK-8100 Arhus C / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRABSEN, Erik Dalgasgade 43 DK-7400 Herning / DK | 02 /
OTTOSEN, Niels Sk rb kvej 38 DK-8600 Silkeborg / DK | 03 /
KNARRENBORG, Lisbeth Dalgasgade 43 DK-7400 Herning / DK | [1996/09] | Representative(s) | Zeuthen-Aagaard, Henrik, et al Chas. Hude 33 H.C. Andersens Boulevard 1553 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1996/09] | Zeuthen-Aagaard, Henrik, et al Chas. Hude, 33 H.C. Andersens Boulevard DK-1553 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 94916155.8 | 11.05.1994 | [1996/09] | WO1994DK00190 | Priority number, date | DK19930000561 | 13.05.1993 Original published format: DK 56193 | [1996/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9426121 | Date: | 24.11.1994 | [1994/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0697816 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0697816 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 24.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A23C3/00 | [1996/09] | CPC: |
A23C3/033 (EP,US);
A23C7/046 (EP,US);
A23C9/1422 (EP,US);
A23C2210/208 (EP,US);
A23C2210/254 (EP,US);
A23C2210/256 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/09] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MILCH | [1996/09] | English: | A PLANT AND A METHOD OF TREATING MILK | [1996/09] | French: | INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT DU LAIT ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE | [1996/09] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.1995 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.10.1995 | Examination requested [1996/09] | 29.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.01.1999
25.05.1999
WITHDRAWN AB Tetra Pak Ruben Rausings Gata SE-221 86 Lund / SE Opponent's representative Raffnsoee, Knud Rosenstand Awapatent A/S Rigensgade 11 1316 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1999/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.01.1999
AB Tetra Pak Ruben Rausings gata SE-221 86 Lund / SE Opponent's representative Raffnsöe, Knud Rosenstand Internationalt Patent-Bureau, 23 Höje Taastrup Boulevard 2630 Taastrup / DK | 11.02.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.03.2001 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 31.03.2001 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2001/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4140806 (GLIMENIUS ALF R, et al); | [Y]US4569759 (BEN AIM ROGER [FR], et al); | [Y]US4876100 (HOLM SUNE [SE], et al) |