blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0697041

EP0697041 - CENTRIFUGAL SPINNING PROCESS AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.12.1997
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 19.02.2003  [2003/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
König, Reinhard, Dr.-Ing.
Mahlbergweg 5
D-76275 Ettlingen / DE
[1996/08]
Inventor(s)01 / KÖNIG, Reinhard
Mahlbergweg 5
D-76275 Ettlingen / DE
02 / KÖNIG, Friedrich
Mahlbergweg 5
D-76275 Ettlingen / DE
03 / KÖNIG, Georg
Mahlbergweg 5
D-76275 Ettlingen / DE
[1996/08]
Representative(s)Mierswa, Klaus
Iridium IP
Friedrich-König-Strasse 3-5
68167 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/08]Mierswa, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing.
Friedrichstrasse 171
D-68199 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date94916192.104.05.1994
[1996/08]
WO1994EP01415
Priority number, dateWO1993EP0107804.05.1993         Original published format: PCT/EP93/01078
[1996/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9425650
Date:10.11.1994
[1994/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0697041
Date:21.02.1996
[1996/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0697041
Date:12.02.1997
Language:DE
[1997/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.11.1994
ClassificationIPC:D01H1/08
[1996/08]
CPC:
D01H1/08 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1996/08]
TitleGerman:ZENTRIFUGENSPINNVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG HIERZU[1996/08]
English:CENTRIFUGAL SPINNING PROCESS AND DEVICE[1996/08]
French:PROCEDE DE FILATURE PAR EFFET CENTRIFUGE ET DISPOSITIF A CET EFFET[1996/08]
Entry into regional phase17.10.1995National basic fee paid 
17.10.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
17.10.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.10.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.10.1995Examination requested  [1996/08]
24.06.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
02.07.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
08.07.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.1996Fee for grant paid
04.10.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.11.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1998/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.04.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES12.02.1997
NL12.02.1997
AT04.05.1997
SE12.05.1997
[2003/08]
Former [2002/26]ES12.02.1997
AT04.05.1997
SE12.05.1997
Former [1998/40]AT04.05.1997
SE12.05.1997
Former [1998/11]SE12.05.1997
Cited inInternational search[A]GB779773  (CARLOS PUJOL) [A] 1,9,10 * figure 2 *;
 [AD]GB918963  (W C T HART & ZN INSTR APP NFAB) [AD] 1,9,10 * page 2, line 47 - line 50; figure 1A *;
 [A]GB1048259  (MITSUBISHI SHIPBUILDING & ENG) [A] 1,9,10 * page 7, line 80 - line 102; figure 10 *;
 [A]DE1510525  (BOBKOWICZ E) [A] 1,9,10 * page 6, paragraph 1; figure 1 *;
 [AD]DE2103717  (WILHELM STAHLECKER) [AD] 1,9,10* figure - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.