EP0715801 - AIRBORNE SENSOR FOR LISTENING TO ACOUSTIC SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION 1840 Century Park East Century City Los Angeles, California 90067-2199 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/24] | For all designated states NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION 1840 Century Park East Century City Los Angeles California 90067-2199 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUER, Andrew, B. 627 Monroe Avenue Orange, CA 92667 / US | [1996/24] | Representative(s) | Lomas, Geoffrey Michael Barker Brettell LLP Medina Chambers Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/34] | Lomas, Geoffrey Michael Barker Brettell Medina Chambers, Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | ||
Former [1996/24] | Attfield, Donald James Barker, Brettell & Duncan 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 94916682.1 | 06.05.1994 | [1996/24] | WO1994US05057 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9531083 | Date: | 16.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0715801 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0715801 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.11.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04R23/00, H04R1/08 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
H04R23/00 (EP,US);
Y10S367/901 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/24] | H04R23/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1996/24] | Title | German: | FLUGZEUGSENSOR ZUM ABHÖREN AKUSTISCHER SIGNALE | [1996/24] | English: | AIRBORNE SENSOR FOR LISTENING TO ACOUSTIC SIGNALS | [1996/24] | French: | DETECTEUR AERIEN SERVANT A ECOUTER DES SIGNAUX ACOUSTIQUES | [1996/24] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.1994 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.1994 | Search fee paid | 06.12.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.1994 | Examination requested [1996/24] | 19.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 12.02.2004 | [2004/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE1703447 (FLYGMAAL AIR TARGET LTD AB) [Y] 1,2 * page 4, line 18 - page 5, line 7 * * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 6 * [A] 3-11; | [YA]US4699004 (EVANS JOHN M [AU], et al) [Y] 1,2 * column 2, lines 39-43 * * column 3, lines 62-67 * [A] 3-11; | [A]US5288955 (STAPLE BRUCE W [US], et al) [A] 1-11* column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 54 * | International search | [A]US4388502 (COHN ROBERT B) |