EP0699098 - METHOD OF REMOVING WATER FROM WASTE OIL USING SURFACE-ACTIVE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.1997 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.06.1997 [1997/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/10] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPEI, Brigitte Bahlenstrasse 162 D-40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
JONKE, Hermann Sudetenstrasse 26 D-40231 Düsseldorf / DE | [1996/10] | Application number, filing date | 94916960.1 | 13.05.1994 | [1996/10] | WO1994EP01554 | Priority number, date | DE19934317046 | 21.05.1993 Original published format: DE 4317046 | [1996/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9427701 | Date: | 08.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0699098 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B01D17/05, B01D17/02, B01D17/038 | [1996/10] | CPC: |
C08G73/0226 (EP);
B01D17/047 (EP);
C08G65/26 (EP);
C10G33/04 (EP);
C10M175/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR [1996/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENTWÄSSERUNG VON ALTÖL UNTER VERWENDUNG VON OBERFLÄCHENAKTIVEN VERBINDUNGEN | [1996/10] | English: | METHOD OF REMOVING WATER FROM WASTE OIL USING SURFACE-ACTIVE COMPOUNDS | [1996/10] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LA DESHYDRATATION D'HUILES USEES A L'AIDE DE COMPOSES TENSIOACTIFS | [1996/10] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.1995 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/10] | 23.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/26] | 24.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1997/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2507613 (MARATHON OIL COMPANY) [A] 1,7,8 * page 5, line 32 - page 6, line 17 * * page 10, line 13 - line 15 * * page 11, line 14 - line 16 *; | [AD]DE4040022 (BAYER AG) [AD] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2039901 (HOECHST AG) [A] 1,3 * abstract *; | [A]AU492350 (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION) [A] 1,3 * claim - * |