19.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] |
21.05.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] |
03.10.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] |
13.06.2003 |
Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published |
published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] |
07.03.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.04.2003 [2003/17] |
19.02.2003 |
Opposition procedure terminated |
|
16.08.2002 |
Communication of examination report in opposition |
|
16.08.2002 |
Opposition withdrawn |
published on 02.10.2002 [2002/40] |
29.04.2002 |
Communication of examination report in opposition |
|
01.12.1998 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
22.09.1998 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
14.08.1998 |
Opposition filed |
published on 30.09.1998 [1998/40] |
11.08.1998 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
12.09.1997 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.10.1997 [1997/44] |
08.07.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.05.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.04.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.03.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
27.06.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.06.1996 |
First examination report |
|
04.06.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
31.05.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.02.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.03.1996 [1996/12] |
02.02.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.03.1996 [1996/12] |