EP0701711 - PROCESS AND CIRCUIT FOR OPERATING AN ELECTRIC CAR SEAT HEATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 13.06.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WÄRME- UND ELEKTROTECHNIK B. RUTHENBERG GMBH Rudolf-Diesel-Strasse 12 D-85235 Odelzhausen / DE | [1996/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUBNER, Georg Ludwigstrasse 1 D-92348 Berg / DE | 02 /
LORENZEN, Günter Röntgenweg 2 D-82140 Olching / DE | [1996/12] | Representative(s) | Schneck, Herbert, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/12] | Schneck, Herbert, Dipl.-Phys., Dr., et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 D-90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 94916971.8 | 18.05.1994 | [1996/12] | WO1994EP01601 | Priority number, date | DE19934318432 | 03.06.1993 Original published format: DE 4318432 | [1996/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9429780 | Date: | 22.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0701711 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0701711 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G05D23/19, B60H1/00 | [1996/12] | CPC: |
B60H1/00285 (EP,US);
B60N2/5685 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1996/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUM BETRIEB EINER ELEKTRISCHEN AUTOSITZHEIZUNG | [1996/12] | English: | PROCESS AND CIRCUIT FOR OPERATING AN ELECTRIC CAR SEAT HEATER | [1996/12] | French: | PROCEDE ET CIRCUIT PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN CHAUFFAGE ELECTRIQUE POUR SIEGES D'AUTOMOBILES | [1996/12] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.1995 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.07.1995 | Examination requested [1996/12] | 07.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.07.1998
08.07.2002
WITHDRAWN I.G. Bauerhin GmbH Philipp-Reis-Strasse 28 63584 Gründau / Rothenbergen / DE Opponent's representative Kehl, Günther Kehl, Ascherl, Liebhoff & Ettmayr Patentanwälte Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.07.1998
08.07.2002
WITHDRAWN I.G. Bauerhin GmbH Philipp-Reis-Strasse 28 63584 Gründau / Rothenbergen / DE Opponent's representative Kehl, Günther, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwaltskanzlei Günther Kehl Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.07.1998
I.G. Bauerhin GmbH Philipp-Reis-Strasse 28 63584 Gründau / Rothenbergen / DE Opponent's representative Kehl, Günther Patentanwaltskanzlei Günther Kehl Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | 25.09.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.11.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 21.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 03.03.2003 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2003/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 18.05.2002 | ES | 19.05.2002 | SE | 19.05.2002 | FR | 31.01.2003 | [2005/01] |
Former [2004/28] | GB | 18.05.2002 | |
ES | 19.05.2002 | ||
FR | 31.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | GB | 18.05.2002 | |
FR | 31.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/17] | GB | 18.05.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9217344 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2 * page 7, line 7 - page 11, line 8; figures 1-7 *; | [DA]DE3329354 (RUTHENBERG GMBH WAERMETECHNIK [DE]) [DA] 1 * page 5, line 9 - page 9, line 24; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0445905 (NARTRON CORP [US]) [A] * the whole document * |