EP0662272 - TELEVISION RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | [2008/39] |
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | |||
Former [1995/28] | For all designated states PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERRY, Alan, John 69 Catford Hill London SE6 4PW / GB | [1995/28] | Representative(s) | Andrews, Arthur Stanley, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/28] | Andrews, Arthur Stanley, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 94917130.0 | 16.06.1994 | [1995/28] | WO1994IB00159 | Priority number, date | GB19930012690 | 18.06.1993 Original published format: GB 9312690 | [1995/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9501051 | Date: | 05.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0662272 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0662272 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445 | [1995/28] | CPC: |
H04N7/0122 (EP,US);
H04N5/445 (KR);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/4884 (EP,US);
H04N5/44504 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/28] | Title | German: | FERNSEHEMPFÄNGER | [1995/28] | English: | TELEVISION RECEIVER | [1995/28] | French: | RECEPTEUR DE TELEVISION | [1995/28] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.1995 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/35] | 01.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 07.04.1999 | IT | 07.04.1999 | NL | 07.04.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/08] | BE | 07.04.1999 | |
NL | 07.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | BE | 07.04.1999 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]EP0546880 (NOKIA CONSUMER ELECTRONICS FRA [FR]); | [Y]GB2242594 (FERGUSON LTD [GB]); | [A]US4882625 (AKIYAMA TORU [JP]); | [PX]US5298995 (MONTA HIROKI [JP], et al) |