Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0801545
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
25.06.1999 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 11.08.1999 [1999/32] |
11.06.1999 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 28.07.1999 [1999/30] |
08.02.1999 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
07.07.1998 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
05.09.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.10.1997 [1997/43] |
05.09.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.10.1997 [1997/43] |
04.09.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.06.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.12.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.12.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.12.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.05.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.02.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|