EP0708622 - STORAGE CONTAINER FOR INTRAVASCULAR CATHETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.11.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.1998 | Refusal of application | published on 30.12.1998 [1998/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHNEIDER INC. 5905 Nathan Lane Plymouth, MN 55442 / US | [1996/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCGLINCH, Timothy, M. Apartment 307 608 Lincoln Avenue St. Paul, MN 55102 / US | [1996/18] | Representative(s) | Ruddock, Keith Stephen Pfizer ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | Ruddock, Keith Stephen Pfizer Limited, European Patent Department, Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94917775.2 | 24.06.1994 | [1996/18] | WO1994IB00179 | Priority number, date | US19930093070 | 16.07.1993 Original published format: US 93070 | [1996/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9502374 | Date: | 26.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0708622 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/02, A61M25/00 | [1996/18] | CPC: |
A61M25/002 (EP,US);
A61B2050/0056 (EP,US);
A61B2050/0065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/18] | Title | German: | LAGERBEHÄLTER FÜR INTRAVASKULÄRE KATHETER | [1996/18] | English: | STORAGE CONTAINER FOR INTRAVASCULAR CATHETERS | [1996/18] | French: | CONTENANT DE STOCKAGE POUR CATHETERS INTRAVASCULAIRES | [1996/18] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/18] | 01.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 31.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1998/53] | 10.08.1998 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1998 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]WO8907460 (CUNDELL DECORPRINT LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,6,12 * figures 2-5 * * page 6, line 16 - line 25 * * page 8, line 5 - line 22 * * page 9, line 26 - line 32 * * claims 1,11 * [A] 3,10,13,22 [Y] 11,15,16; | [XAY]US4106621 (SORENSON JAMES L) [X] 1,2,12,13,16 * figures 6-8 * * column 7, line 19 - line 43 * [A] 3,22 [Y] 11,15; | [YA]US3727750 (PETTER N) [Y] 16 * column W * [A] 1-5,10,11,17-19,22; | [Y]GB1559843 (ICI LTD) [Y] 11,15 * page 2, line 97 - line 99 * |