EP0804590 - BIFUNCTIONAL SELECTABLE FUSION GENES BASED ON THE CYTOSINE DEAMINASE (CD) GENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.06.1998 [1998/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TARGETED GENETICS CORPORATION Suite 100, 1100 Olive Way Seattle, WA 98101 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | For all designated states TARGETED GENETICS CORPORATION Suite 100, 1100 Olive Way Seattle, WA 98101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUPTON, Stephen, D. 3122 N.E. 83rd Street Seattle, WA 98115 / US | [1997/45] | Representative(s) | Goldin, Douglas Michael J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | Goldin, Douglas Michael J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 94918041.8 | 19.05.1994 | [1997/45] | WO1994US05601 | Priority number, date | US19930066388 | 21.05.1993 Original published format: US 66388 | [1997/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9428143 | Date: | 08.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0804590 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/55, C12N15/62, C12N15/86, C12N15/65 | [1997/45] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP);
C12N15/65 (EP);
C12N9/78 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (EP);
C12N2740/13043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/45] | Title | German: | BIFUNKTIONELLE SELEKTIERBARE FUSIONSGENE AUF DEM CYTOSIN-DEAMINASE (CD) GEN BERUHEND | [1997/45] | English: | BIFUNCTIONAL SELECTABLE FUSION GENES BASED ON THE CYTOSINE DEAMINASE (CD) GENE | [1997/45] | French: | GENES DE FUSION SELECTABLES ET BIFONCTIONNELS SE BASANT SUR LE GENE DE CYTOSINE-DEAMINASE (CD) | [1997/45] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.12.1995 | Examination requested [1997/45] | 22.12.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/24] | 13.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1997 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0402108 (ONCOGENE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP) [X] 1 * page 8, paragraph L - page 9, paragraph 1; figures 11,12 * [Y] 2-15; | [Y]WO9301281 (THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA) [Y] 1-15 * figure 1 *; | [Y]WO9208796 (IMMUNEX CORPORATION) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1-11 *; | [PX]WO9321959 (THE UNITED STATE OF AMERICA) [PX] 1-15 * page 14 - page 15; claims 1-3,12,26 * | [XY] - AUSTIN E. A. ET AL., "A first step in the development of gene therapy for colorectal carcinoma: cloning, sequencing, and expression of Escherichia coli cytosine deaminase", MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY, (199303), vol. 43, no. 3, pages 380 - 387 [X] 1 * page 380, column L; figure 1 * * page 386, column L * [Y] 2-15 | [YD] - MULLEN C. A. ET AL., "Transfer of the bacterial gene for cytosine deaminase to mammalian cells confers lethal sensitivity to 5-fluorocytosine: a negative selection system", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, WASHINGTON US, (199201), vol. 89, pages 33 - 37 [YD] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - DANIELSEN S. ET AL., "Characterization of the Escherichia coli codBA operon encoding cytosine permease and cytosine deaminase", MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, (199205), vol. 6, no. 10, pages 1335 - 1344 [A] * the whole document * |