EP0746594 - CORRECTION FLUID FOR WATER-FAST INKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.06.2001 [2001/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Gillette Company Prudential Tower Building Boston, MA 02199 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | For all designated states THE GILLETTE COMPANY Prudential Tower Building Boston, Massachusetts 02199 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCHUGH, Brian, K. 103 Pinnacle Road Harvard, MA 01451 / US | 02 /
SANBORN, Norman, G. 30 Sherry Lane South Weymouth, MA 02190 / US | [1996/50] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94918179.6 | 31.05.1994 | [1996/50] | WO1994US06114 | Priority number, date | US19930072168 | 04.06.1993 Original published format: US 72168 | US19940240159 | 10.05.1994 Original published format: US 240159 | [1996/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9429393 | Date: | 22.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0746594 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0746594 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.12.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C09D10/00, C08K3/22 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
C09D10/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/50] | Title | German: | KORREKTURFLÜSSIGKEIT FÜR WASSERFESTE TINTEN | [2000/15] | English: | CORRECTION FLUID FOR WATER-FAST INKS | [1996/50] | French: | FLUIDE DE CORRECTION | [1996/50] |
Former [1996/50] | KORREKTURFLÜSSIGKEIT FÜR WÄSSERFESTE TINTEN | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.1996 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.1996 | Search fee paid | 02.01.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/50] | 01.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/26] | Request for further processing for: | 07.01.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 07.01.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.02.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2058110 (COLUMBIA RIBBON CARBON MFG) [A] 1,21* abstract * | International search | [X]US3769255 (SHEEHAN G, et al); | [X]JPH01261473 (TOMBOW PENCIL); | [X]JPH02173167 (PENTEL KK); | [X]DE4036625 (TIPP EX GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [X]JPH055071 (PENTEL KK) |