EP0702693 - TANDEM SYNTHETIC HIV-1 PEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2007 | Refusal of application | published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Pasteur Limited 1755 Steeles Avenue West Toronto Ontario M2R 3T4 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states Aventis Pasteur Limited 1755 Steeles Avenue West Toronto, Ontario M2R 3T4 / CA | ||
Former [1996/13] | For all designated states CONNAUGHT LABORATORIES LIMITED 1755 Steeles Avenue West Willowdale Ontario M2R 3T4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIA, Charles D.Y. 27 Mabley Crescent Thornhill, Ontario L4J 2Z7 / CA | 02 /
CHONG, Pele 32 Estoril Street Richmond Hill, Ontario L4C 0BC / CA | 03 /
KLEIN, Michel H. 16 Mundo Boulevard Willowdale, Ontario M2P 1B9 / CA | [1996/13] | Representative(s) | Smart, Peter John Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | Smart, Peter John W.H. BECK, GREENER & CO 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94918258.8 | 08.06.1994 | [1996/13] | WO1994CA00317 | Priority number, date | US19930073378 | 09.06.1993 Original published format: US 73378 | [1996/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9429339 | Date: | 22.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0702693 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/08, C07K7/10, C07K15/00, A61K39/21, C12N15/48, G01N33/569 | [1996/13] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C07K7/08 (KR);
A61K39/21 (KR);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K14/155 (KR);
G01N33/569 (KR);
G01N33/56988 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C12N2740/16022 (EP,US);
C12N2740/16034 (EP,US);
C12N2740/16122 (EP,US);
C12N2740/16222 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/13] | Title | German: | SYNTHETISCHE HIV-1-TANDEMPEPTEDE | [1996/13] | English: | TANDEM SYNTHETIC HIV-1 PEPTIDES | [1996/13] | French: | PEPTIDES SYNTHETIQUES EN TANDEM CONTRE LE VIH-1 | [1996/13] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/13] | 07.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 18.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.12.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/16] | 16.12.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 31.01.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/16] | Appeal following examination | 24.02.2006 | Appeal received No. T0780/06 | 24.04.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 31.01.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | 22.02.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | 30.01.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 30.01.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.02.2004 | Decision despatched | 09.08.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 14.08.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.10.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]WO9013564 (CONNAUGHT LAB [CA]); | [A]WO9102544 (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR], et al); | [X]WO9222641 (VIROGENETICS CORP [US]); | [PX]EP0577894 (GREEN CROSS KOREA [KR]); |