EP0804239 - ANTI-STRESS, ANTI-IMPAIRMENT AND ANTI-AGING DRUG AND PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Riga, Dan Sector 1, Belgrade Street 7 71248 Bucharest / RO | For all designated states Riga, Sorin Sector 1, Belgrade Street 7 71248 Bucharest / RO | [1997/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/45] | Representative(s) | Petra, Elke, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Liermann-Castell Am Rurufer 2 52349 Düren / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Petra, Elke, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Liermann-Castell Gutenbergstrasse 12 52349 Düren / DE | ||
Former [1997/45] | Petra, Elke, Dipl.-Ing., et al Will & Petra Rechts- und Patentanwälte Neue Poststrasse 21 85598 Baldham / DE | Application number, filing date | 94919023.5 | 02.06.1994 | [1997/45] | WO1994RO00003 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9533486 | Date: | 14.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0804239 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0804239 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/06 | [1997/45] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P39/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/45] | Extension states | SI | 20.12.1996 | Title | German: | ARZNEIMITTEL GEGEN STRESS, BEEINTRÄCHTIGUNG UND ALTWERDEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [1997/45] | English: | ANTI-STRESS, ANTI-IMPAIRMENT AND ANTI-AGING DRUG AND PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING THEREOF | [1997/45] | French: | MEDICAMENT ANTI-STRESS, ANTI-DEFICIENCE ET ANTI-VIEILLISSEMENT ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1997/45] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/45] | 03.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/35] | Request for further processing for: | 09.09.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 09.09.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.09.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 15.09.1999 | [2004/07] | Cited in | International search | [T] - Predescu V et al, "Antagonic-stress: A new treatment in gerontopsychiatry and for a healthy productive life", ANNALS OF THE NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, (19940630), vol. 717, pages 315 - 331 [T] 1-8 * 5th CONGRESS OF THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF BIOMEDICAL GERONTOLOGY, BUDAPEST, HUNGARY, JULY 1-3, 1993; page 317, line 29 - line 40 * |