EP0701572 - COMPOSITE SYNTHETIC PEPTIDE CONSTRUCT ELICITING NEUTRALIZING ANTIBODIES AND CYTOTOXIC T LYMPHOCYTES AGAINST HIV [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2000 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.2000 [2000/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, as represented by THE SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES The National Institute of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, 6011 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325 Rockville, MD 20852 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/19] | For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, as represented by THE SECRETARY OF THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES National Institute of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, 6011 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325 Rockville, MD 20852-3804 / US | ||
Former [1999/16] | For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as represented by the SECRETARY OF THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES National Institute of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, 6011 Executive Boulevard Rockville, MD 20852 / US | ||
Former [1996/12] | For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as represented by the SECRETARY OF THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES National Institute of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, Westwood Building, Box OTT Bethesda, MD 20892-9902 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERZOFSKY, Jay, A. 9321 Corsica Drive Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | 02 /
AHLERS, Jeffrey, D. 3320 Plyers Mill Road Kensington, MD 20895 / US | 03 /
PENDLETON, C., David 4998 Battery Lane, 417 Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | 04 /
NARA, Peter 6516 Sunset Drive Frederick, MD 21702 / US | 05 /
SHIRAI, Mutsunori Idai Ikenobe Shukusha A202, 1239-2, Ikenobe Miki-chou, Kita-gun, Kagawa 761-01 / JP | [1996/12] | Representative(s) | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/12] | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London, EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 94919119.1 | 13.05.1994 | [1996/12] | WO1994US05142 | Priority number, date | US19930060988 | 14.05.1993 Original published format: US 60988 | [1996/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9426785 | Date: | 24.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0701572 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0701572 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/16, A61K39/00, C12Q1/68 | [1999/32] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
A61K38/03 (EP,US);
A61K38/55 (EP,US);
A61K38/556 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K39/21 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61K2039/545 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55516 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55566 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55577 (EP,US);
A61K2039/57 (EP,US);
A61K2039/645 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C12N2740/16122 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/03, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/556, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/55, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/12] | C07K15/00, A61K39/00, C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/12] | Title | German: | SYNTHETISCHE MISCHPEPTIDE, DIE DIE ENTSTEHUNG VON NEUTRALISIERENDEN ANTIKÖRPERN UND DIE WIRKUNG DER CYTOTOXISCHEN T-LYMPHOZYTEN GEGEN HIV HERVORUFEN | [1996/12] | English: | COMPOSITE SYNTHETIC PEPTIDE CONSTRUCT ELICITING NEUTRALIZING ANTIBODIES AND CYTOTOXIC T LYMPHOCYTES AGAINST HIV | [1996/12] | French: | PRODUITS GENETIQUES DE PEPTIDES SYNTHETIQUES COMPOSITES DECLENCHANT DES ANTICORPS ET DES LYMPHOCYTES T CYTOTOXIQUES DE NEUTRALISATION CONTRE VIH | [1996/12] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/12] | 23.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9304697 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US]) |