EP0737256 - MICROWAVE PLASMA REACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.2001 [2001/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APPLIED SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, INC. 35 Cabot Road Woburn Massachusetts 01801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states APPLIED SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, INC. 35 Cabot Road Woburn, Massachusetts 01801 / US | ||
Former [1996/42] | For all designated states APPLIED SCIENCE TECHNOLOGY 35 Cabot Road Woburn, MA 01801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BESEN, Mathew M. 49 Baldwin Street Tewskbury, MA 01876 / US | 02 /
SEVILLANO, Evelio 6 Volunteer Way Lexington, MA 02173 / US | 03 /
SMITH, Donald K. 167 Waverly Street Arlington, MA 02174 / US | [1996/42] | Representative(s) | Butler, Michael John, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/42] | Butler, Michael John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 94919170.4 | 19.05.1994 | [1996/42] | WO1994US05619 | Priority number, date | US19930072272 | 04.06.1993 Original published format: US 72272 | US19940219208 | 29.03.1994 Original published format: US 219208 | [1996/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9429494 | Date: | 22.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0737256 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0737256 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.12.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/50, H01J37/32 | [1996/52] | CPC: |
C23C16/511 (EP,US);
H01J37/32192 (EP,US);
H01J37/32211 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/42] | C23C16/50 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1996/42] | Title | German: | MIKROWELLENPLASMAREAKTOR | [1996/42] | English: | MICROWAVE PLASMA REACTOR | [1996/42] | French: | GENERATEUR DE PLASMA A MICRO-ONDES | [1996/42] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.1996 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.1996 | Search fee paid | 04.01.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 04.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/42] | 12.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 20.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9100613 (INST MIKROELEKTRONIK IM [SE]) [A] 1,2,5-9,19 * page 3, line 38 - page 4, line 25 * * page 5, line 17 - line 35 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0264913 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1,19 * column 14, line 54 - column 15, line 13; figure 23 *; | [A]US4910041 (YANAGIHARA KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 2-4,19 * column 10, line 62 - column 11, line 2 * * figure 14 *; | [A]JPS63311726 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 05, Database accession no. 89-037019, XP002016541 & JPS63311726 A 19881220 (ULVAC CORP.) [A] 20-22 * abstract * | International search | [A]US4919077 (ODA MASAO [JP], et al); | [X]EP0443154 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]JPS6446916 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]JPH02277776 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |