11.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] |
14.06.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 31.07.2002 [2002/31] |
15.02.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
02.10.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
02.10.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.07.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.05.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
05.05.2001 |
Change - inventor |
published on 20.06.2001 [2001/25] |
29.03.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
06.02.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.09.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
06.09.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.07.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.07.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.02.2000 |
First examination report |
|
17.02.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.07.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.07.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.02.1998 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 01.04.1998 [1998/14] |
19.09.1997 |
Change - applicant |
published on 05.11.1997 [1997/45] |
05.07.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.07.1997 |
Change - applicant |
published on 20.08.1997 [1997/34] |
30.05.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.07.1997 [1997/29] |
30.05.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.07.1997 [1997/29] |
13.05.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.05.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.04.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.01.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.03.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.02.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|